Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Law Offices Of Jennie Levin, Sherman Law Firm, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Kane Harry Nathan, Sherman Stuart Mark, against Advanced Multispecialty Surgery Center Inc., Anthony Bledin Md Inc At Sunset Diagnostic Radiology, Elite Surgery Center Of Beverly Hills Inc., Interventional Pain Management Medical Group Inc., Los Angeles Minimally Invasive Spine Institute, (total of 10) See All represented by Bass Gerald L., Sparks Jerry R., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Randolph M. Hammock presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management153 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Complaint (in Interpleader)
Date: December 19, 2018Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Notice Acknowledgment and Receipt; Filed by: Sherman Law Firm (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Complaint in Interpleader; Filed by: Sherman Law Firm (Plaintiff); As to: Julio Rodriguez (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Sherman Law Firm (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Law Offices of Jennie Levin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Wilshire Surgicenter, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Default entered as to David Mordecai, MD; On the Complaint filed by Sherman Law Firm on
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sherman Law Firm (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Sherman Law Firm (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Sherman Law Firm (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00; On the Complaint filed by Sherman Law Firm on
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Los Angeles Minimally Invasive Spine Institute (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Default entered as to Julio Rodriguez; On the Complaint filed by Sherman Law Firm on
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Sherman Law Firm (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Sherman Law Firm (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Default entered as to PS Finance, II; On the Complaint filed by Sherman Law Firm on
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Order for Discharge; Filed by: Sherman Law Firm (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Ruling-Petition For Discharge of Liability; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Sherman Law Firm (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Notice (of Deposit of Interpleader Funds)
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (Cross-Complaint filed by Los Angeles Minimally Invasive Spine filed on )
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Answer (to Complaint for Interpleader)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Wilshire Surgicenter, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) (RE Malcolm H. Mackey)
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Answer (Wilshire Surgicenter, Incs answer to complaint in interpleader)
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of )
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Complaint (in Interpleader)
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Notice (Acknowledgment and Receipt)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment (/Default Rejected)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Order (for Discharge)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Ruling-Petition For Discharge of Liability
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Petition to Discharge))
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of )
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: October 20, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Notice (of Deposit of Interpleader Funds)
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Answer (Wilshire Surgicenter, Incs answer to complaint in interpleader)
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Answer (to Complaint for Interpleader)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) (RE Malcolm H. Mackey)
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 03/06/2019)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (Cross-Complaint filed by Los Angeles Minimally Invasive Spine filed on 3/6/19)
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Notice (Acknowledgment and Receipt)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 09/13/2021)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment (/Default Rejected)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.