Case Last Refreshed: 3 hours ago
Barkett Lisa Ann, Stephan Debra, Stephan George, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Friedberg Jerome H, Kim Shaighn Sung-Yun, Montegomery James I, against Barkett Anthony Robert, Barkett Chervak Jacqueline Lauren, Barkett Joseph William, Barkett Lisa Ann, Barkett Lisa Ann Aka Lisa Denton Barkett, (total of 19) See All represented by Gilmore David M., Mcgonigle Timothy D, Mcgonigle Timothy D., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Elaine Lu presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management126 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions210 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: George Stephan (Plaintiff); As to: Lisa Ann Barkett (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Lisa Ann Barkett (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: George Stephan (Plaintiff); Debra Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by: George Stephan (Plaintiff); Debra Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: George Stephan (Cross-Defendant); Debra Stephan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Declaration of Demurring Party re Auto Extension; Filed by: Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Order Decision Denying Application for Right to Attach Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion to Strike; Filed by: Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter; Signed and Filed by:
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by: Jacqueline Lauren Barkett Chervak (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Declaration in Support; Filed by: Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Reply To Opposition To Motion to Quash Service; Filed by: Jacqueline Lauren Barkett Chervak (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: George Stephan (Cross-Defendant); Debra Stephan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Reply in support of Demurrer; Filed by: Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions; Filed by: Debra Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Lisa Ann Barkett (Defendant); Joseph William Barkett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: George Stephan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: George Stephan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: George Stephan (Cross-Defendant); Debra Stephan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Lisa Ann Barkett (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Jacqueline Lauren Barkett Chervak (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Motion for Stay of Proceedings; Filed by: William J. Barkett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Silverado Management and Holding Company, a Nevada corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Lisa Ann Barkett (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: Lisa Ann Barkett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Lisa Ann Barkett (Defendant); Joseph William Barkett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: George Stephan (Cross-Defendant); Debra Stephan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Reply to opposition to stay case; Filed by: Lisa Ann Barkett (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Lisa Ann Barkett (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities supplemental; Filed by: Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Stipulation and Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: George Stephan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Lisa Ann Barkett (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Demurrer; Filed by: Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: George Stephan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: George Stephan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: George Stephan (Plaintiff); Debra Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Association of Counsel; Filed by: George Stephan (Plaintiff); Debra Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: George Stephan (Plaintiff); Debra Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Lisa Ann Barkett (Appellant)
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid paid Steven A. Malcoun; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-21T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Motion; Filed by: Lisa Ann Barkett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcripts Deposit Paid Paid for Lisa Ann Barkett; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-27T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: George Stephan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: William J. Barkett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: George Stephan (Cross-Defendant); Debra Stephan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement Amended; Filed by: Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Declaration IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL; Filed by: Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Reply in Support of Motion to Strike; Filed by: Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Court
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by: Jacqueline Lauren Barkett Chervak (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Demurrers Under Submission) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: James I Montegomery (Attorney)
Date: 2023-10-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: George Stephan (Cross-Defendant); Debra Stephan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- Respondent; Filed by: Diane Malcoun (Respondent)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: George Stephan (Cross-Defendant); Debra Stephan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Opposition to Cross-Complainant's Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2024-02-06T00:00:00Updated -- Judgment: Filed By: Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date:
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: George Stephan (Cross-Defendant); Debra Stephan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Lisa Ann Barkett (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Errata; Filed by: Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: Lisa Ann Barkett (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid Paid for Lisa Ann Barkett; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-27T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued N.O.A. ; B318270; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Steven Malcoun (Respondent)
Date: 2023-11-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs on Appeal; Filed by: Diane Malcoun (Respondent); As to: Lisa Ann Barkett (Appellant)
Date: 2024-01-31T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-08-11T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order; Filed by: Joseph William Barkett (Defendant)
Date: 2023-11-16T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed B318270 NOA ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2024-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Motion; Filed by: Lisa Ann Barkett (Appellant)
Date: 2024-01-08T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Opposition to the Appointment of Discovery Referee; Filed by: Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Order RE: PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR ISSUE, EVIDENTIARY, AND MONETARY SANCTIONS; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Steven Malcoun (Respondent)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: Lisa Ann Barkett (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-06-06T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: Lisa Ann Barkett (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-06-06T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid paid for Diana Malcoum; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-10-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by George Stephan (Plaintiff); Debra Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by George Stephan (Plaintiff); Debra Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by George Stephan (Plaintiff); Debra Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Complaint Filed by George Stephan (Plaintiff); Debra Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by George Stephan (Plaintiff); Debra Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00amended complaint Filed by George Stephan (Plaintiff); Debra Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st) Filed by George Stephan (Plaintiff); Debra Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Order (RE: DEFENDATS' DEMURRER TO AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Notice (of Association of Counsel) Filed by George Stephan (Plaintiff); Debra Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury Filed by George Stephan (Plaintiff); Debra Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Lisa Ann Barkett (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Order (RE: DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA TO THE UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint) Filed by Lisa Ann Barkett (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by William J. Barkett (Defendant); Lisa Ann Barkett (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Lisa Ann Barkett (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike Defendants Responsive Pleadings a...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Subpoena to University of Southern...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by George Stephan (Plaintiff); Debra Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Order (Decision Denying Application for Right to Attach Order) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses MOTIO...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Declaration (in Support) Filed by Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) Filed by Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Lisa Ann Barkett (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing) Filed by Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone Filed by Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by George Stephan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Demurrer) Filed by Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by George Stephan (Cross-Defendant); Debra Stephan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Order (RE: CROSS-DEFENDANT STEVEN MALCOUN?S DEMURRER TO LISA BARKETT?S CROSS-COMPLAINT) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (Amended) Filed by Lisa Ann Barkett (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by George Stephan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) DEMU...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) CROS...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement (Amended) Filed by Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by George Stephan (Cross-Defendant); Debra Stephan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) Filed by George Stephan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) Filed by Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by George Stephan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Order (RE: DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS TO WELLS FARGO BANK AND U.S. BANK) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference (continued from ))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Order (RE: CROSS-DEFENDANT DIANE MALCOUN?S DEMURRER TO LISA BARKETT?S CROSS-COMPLAINT) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) HEAR...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone Filed by Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Reply (in support of Demurrer) Filed by Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons Filed by Jacqueline Lauren Barkett Chervak (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Order (RE: PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR ISSUE, EVIDENTIARY, AND MONETARY SANCTIONS) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Order (RE: CROSS-DEFENDANTS? DEMURRERS TO LISA BARKETT?S SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Lisa Ann Barkett (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application In Suppo...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Lisa Ann Barkett (Defendant); Joseph William Barkett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Order - Dismissal Filed by Court
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Demurrers Under Submission) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Lisa Ann Barkett (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application re Stay of Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex-Parte Application re Stay of Order) Filed by Anthony Robert Barkett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Judgment (of Dismissal as to Cross-Defendant Diane Malcoun) Filed by Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Answer Filed by George Stephan (Cross-Defendant); Debra Stephan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- Filed by Steven Malcoun (Respondent)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Minute Order) Filed by Lisa Ann Barkett (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs Filed by Lisa Ann Barkett (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed Filed by Lisa Ann Barkett (Appellant)
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Lisa Ann Barkett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed by Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re continuation of CSR hearing dat...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Lisa Ann Barkett (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by George Stephan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER) Filed by Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re the status of criminal proceedings again...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-22T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued (N.O.A. ; B318270) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- (Respondent) Filed by Diane Malcoun (Respondent)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcripts Deposit Paid (Paid for Lisa Ann Barkett) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-27T00:00:00Notice (of entry of minute order) Filed by Lisa Ann Barkett (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: status of the Criminal Proceedings; S...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other GEORGE STEPHAN and DEBRA STEPHAN Mo...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Court Minute Order) Filed by Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: continuance of all motions set...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-06T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- Filed by Lisa Ann Barkett (Appellant)
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid (paid Steven A. Malcoun) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-21T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid (Paid for Lisa Ann Barkett) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-27T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid (paid for Diane Malcoum) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions PLAINTIFFS? NOTICE OF MOTION ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring Party re Auto Extension) Filed by Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash MOTION OF WILLIAM BARKETT AND LISA...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion to Strike) Filed by Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Stipulation and Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by Lisa Ann Barkett (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by George Stephan (Cross-Defendant); Debra Stephan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Stipulation and Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by George Stephan (Cross-Defendant); Debra Stephan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Deposition) Filed by George Stephan (Cross-Defendant); Debra Stephan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons MOTION OF SPECI...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion to Strike) Filed by Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by William J. Barkett (Defendant); Lisa Ann Barkett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Order (RE: CROSS-DEFENDANTS? DEMURRERS TO LISA BARKETT?S FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Minute Order) Filed by Lisa Ann Barkett (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application Filed by Lisa Ann Barkett (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Declaration (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL) Filed by Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by George Stephan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Accelerate hearing date on...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (2nd)) Filed by Lisa Ann Barkett (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Answer Filed by Silverado Management and Holding Company, a Nevada corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Reply (To Opposition To Motion to Quash Service) Filed by Jacqueline Lauren Barkett Chervak (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) DEMU...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL ANT...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) Filed by Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( ((1) Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (3rd)) Filed by Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence Filed by Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Petition Filed by Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION O...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Lisa Ann Barkett (Defendant); Joseph William Barkett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons for Lack of Per...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Motion to Quash Filed by Silverado Management and Holding Company, a Nevada corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication Filed by Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Opposition (to the Appointment of Discovery Referee) Filed by Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by George Stephan (Cross-Defendant); Debra Stephan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Subpoenas served on JP Morgan Chas...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference (continued from ))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: appointment of a discovery referee pu...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Motion to Quash Filed by Jacqueline Lauren Barkett Chervak (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses PLAIN...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons For Lack of Per...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order Filed by Lisa Ann Barkett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Reply (to opposition to stay case) Filed by Lisa Ann Barkett (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings DEFENDANTS ANTHONY ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Motion for Stay of Proceedings Filed by William J. Barkett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Demurrers Under Submission)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Notice (Appendix of Evidence) Filed by Lisa Ann Barkett (Defendant); Joseph William Barkett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Notice (of Errata) Filed by Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Lisa Ann Barkett (Defendant); Joseph William Barkett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions Filed by Debra Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings NOTICE OF MOTION FO...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by William J. Barkett (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by George Stephan (Cross-Defendant); Debra Stephan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by George Stephan (Cross-Defendant); Debra Stephan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions PLAINTIFFS? NOTICE OF MOTION ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Lisa Ann Barkett (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication PLAINTIFFS? NOTICE...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Notice (of court's order dated September 28, 2021) Filed by Lisa Ann Barkett (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (supplemental) Filed by Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Steven Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) Filed by Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Cros...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Notice (Notice of entry of minute order) Filed by Lisa Ann Barkett (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Diane Malcoun (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference (continued from ))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Debra Stephan (Plaintiff); George Stephan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence Filed by Lisa Ann Barkett (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons Filed by Jacqueline Lauren Barkett Chervak (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Order ((proposed) Order) Filed by Jacqueline Lauren Barkett Chervak (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00amended complaint
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Plaintiff George Stephan and Debra Stephan's Statement of Damages
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-01-02T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference and Order to Show Cause Hearing)
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Notice (of Association of Counsel)
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Declaration (OF TIMOTHY V. LOGOLUSO IN SUPPORT OF 30-DAY EXTENSION)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Declaration (OF DAVID GILMORE AS TO MEET AND CONFER ON DEMURRER)
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Notice (of Demurrer to Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (to Plaintiffs Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Declaration (of David Gilmore as to Meet and Confer on Demurrer)
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Declaration (of David Gilmore in reply to opposition to demurrer and motion to strike)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Order (RE: DEFENDATS' DEMURRER TO AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...))
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Response (to Notice of Ruling and Continuance of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Declaration (of David Gilmore)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Notice of Motion (to Strike First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Notice (of Demurrer to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) (First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Subpoena to University of Southern...))
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Order (RE: DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA TO THE UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Shaighn Kim in Support of Motion)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Declaration (in Opposition to Motion)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of the First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' Demurrer to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike Defendants Responsive Pleadings a...))
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (IN REPLY TO THE OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER/MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Order (RE: DEFENDANTS? DEMURRER TO AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...))
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Amended Complaint (SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR MONETARY AND OTHER RELIEF FOR:)
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Notice ( of Entry of Order and Proof of Service)
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Notice (Consent To Electronic Service And Notice Of Electronic Service Address)
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Notice (of Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address)
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Deposition Subpoenas)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF DAVID GILMORE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL)
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Declaration (in Opposition to Motion to Compel)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses MOTIO...))
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Motion re: (Application for Right to Attach Order)
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing)
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Declaration (in Support)
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Declaration (Of William Barket In Oppositon to Application For Writ Of Attachment Against Lisa Barkett)
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Declaration (OF LISA BARKETT IN OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT)
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (In Opposition To Application For A Right To Attach Order)
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Notice (Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Application for Writ of Attachment)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Objection (to Supplemental Declaration)
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Objection (TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Order (Decision Denying Application for Right to Attach Order)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)))
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Joint Status Report; Stipulation)
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (Amended)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring Party re Auto Extension)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference (continued from 03/11/2020)))
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Declaration (of Amara S. Barbara in Support of Demurrer and Motion to Strike Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (to Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Re Striking answers)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Stipulation and Order))
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (for Extension of Time to Request Default Judgments Against Defaulted Entities)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Stipulation and Order) of 10/20/2020)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash MOTION OF WILLIAM BARKETT AND LISA...))
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Order (RE: DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS TO WELLS FARGO BANK AND U.S. BANK)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer to Cross Complaint of Geroge and Debra Stephan)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Opposition (Motion to Strike filed by Cross Defendants George and Debra Stephan)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) DEMU...))
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Opposition to Demurrer and Motion to Strike Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Order (RE: CROSS-DEFENDANT STEVEN MALCOUN?S DEMURRER TO LISA BARKETT?S CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) CROS...))
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) HEAR...))
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Order (RE: CROSS-DEFENDANT DIANE MALCOUN?S DEMURRER TO LISA BARKETT?S CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement (Amended)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion to Strike)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Demurrer)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Declaration (of Steven Malcoun, Meet and Confer, Demurrer to First Amended Cross Compl)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Declaration (of Steven Malcoun, Meet and Confer, Mo to Strike First Amended Cross Compl)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference (continued from 03/11/2020)))
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Notice (Notice of entry of minute order)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Accelerate hearing date on...))
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Minute Order)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE BY STEVEN MALCOUN)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF STEVE MALCOUN)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER FILED BY GEORGE AND DEBRA STEPHAN)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY GEORGE AND DEBRA STEPHAN)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF DIANE MALCOUN)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISQUALIFY GEORGE STEPHAN AS COUNSEL)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Reply (in support of Demurrer)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion to Strike)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Reply (of Diane Malcoun to Opposition of Lisa Barkett to Demurrer to 1st Amended Cross complaint)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISQUALIFY GEORGE STEPHAN
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Motion for Stay of Proceedings
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Notice (of Rescheduled Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication Against Defendant William J. Barkett)
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Notice (of Errata)
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY)
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses PLAIN...))
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Opposition (to the Appointment of Discovery Referee)
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Response (TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISCOVERY REFEREE)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Notice (of Rescheduled Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication Against Defendant Lisa Ann Barkett)
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: appointment of a discovery referee pu...))
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Notice (of Rescheduled Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication Against Defendant William J. Barkett)
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Subpoenas served on JP Morgan Chas...))
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Declaration (OF JACQUELINE (BARKETT) CHERVAK IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS? SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION)
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Declaration (of Timothy D. McGonigle in Support of Motion to Quash Subpoena)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Declaration (of Jacqueline Barkett Chervak in Support of Motion to Quash Subpoena)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Notice (Waiver of Cross-Defendant Diane Malcoun's Right to File Statement of Disqualification)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings DEFENDANTS ANTHONY ...))
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Notice (WAIVER OF CROSS-DEFENDANTS GEORGE & DEBRA STEPHAN'S RIGHT TO FILE STATEMENT OF DISQUALIFICATION)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Brief (Supplemental Briefing on Jurisdictional Issues)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Jerome H. Friedberg ISO Plaintiffs' Supplemental Briefing on Jurisdictional Issues)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 08/10/2021)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons For Lack of Per...))
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Notice (of Court's Minute Order Dated August 10, 2021)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Motion to Seal (Confidential Documents Filed by Plaintiffs)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Order (RE: DEFENDANT JACQUELINE CHERVAK?S MOTION TO SEAL CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS FILED BY PLAINTIFFS)
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons for Lack of Per...))
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Notice (of Court's Order, Dated August 25, 2021)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Response (to Order to Show Cause Regarding Bifurcation of the Fraudulent Conveyance Cause of Action)
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF DAVID GILMORE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ISSUE AND EVIDENTIARY SANCTIONS)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Reply (in support of Motion for Issue and or Evidentiary Sanctions)
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Declaration (In Support of Motion)
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Notice (Appendix of Evidence)
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Declaration (of David Gilmore in opposition to motion for summary judgment-Lisa Barkett)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte Application to Stay the Action; Declaration of Jerome H. Friedberg)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Lisa Barkett in opposition to to Motion for summary judgment)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application In Support Of Application For Stay)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application In Suppo...))
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Notice (of courts continuance of hearing dated September 15, 2021)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Motion for Stay of Proceedings
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Notice (of court's order dated September 28, 2021)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions PLAINTIFFS? NOTICE OF MOTION ...))
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Order (RE: PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR ISSUE, EVIDENTIARY, AND MONETARY SANCTIONS)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication PLAINTIFFS? NOTICE...))
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion for Stay of Case Pending Resolution of Criminal Charges)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Declaration (OF DAVID GILMORE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS TO WELLS FARGO BANK AND US BANK)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations])
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Declaration (of Jerome Friedberg ISO Motion to Compel Further Responses to RFPs by William Barkett)
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Jerome Friedberg ISO Motion to Compel Production of Documents by BMF)
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Answer (SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Declaration (of David Gilmore in Opposition to Motion)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/12/2020)
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition of George and Debra Stephan to William Barkett's Motion to Stay)
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Notice (of Court's Order, Dated October 8, 2021)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (IN REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO WILLIAM BARKETT?S MOTION TO STAY)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( ((1) Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) ...))
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Reply (to opposition to stay case)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Brief (SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF STEVEN MALCOUNS DEMURRER TO THE SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (supplemental)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings NOTICE OF MOTION FO...))
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Order (RE: CROSS-DEFENDANTS? DEMURRERS TO LISA BARKETT?S SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Demurrers Under Submission))
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Demurrers Under Submission) of 11/29/2021)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/03/2021)
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex-Parte Application re Stay of Order)
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application re Stay of Order))
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Judgment (of Dismissal as to Cross-Defendant Diane Malcoun)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 12/21/2021)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING ON DECEMBER 21, 2021)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Court Minute Order)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Motion re: (for Partial Lift of Stay for a Limited Purpose)
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other GEORGE STEPHAN and DEBRA STEPHAN Mo...))
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions PLAINTIFFS? NOTICE OF MOTION ...))
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re continuation of CSR hearing dat...))
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (RE.NOTICE OF MOTION OF LISA ANN BARKETT TO TAX COSTS OF DIANE MALCOUN)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: status of the Criminal Proceedings; S...))
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Status Report (STATEMENT OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS COMPLAINANT LISA BARKETT AS TO STATUS OF APPEAL)
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (RE.NOTICE OF MOTION OF LISA ANN BARKETT TO TAX COSTS OF STEVE MALCOUN)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Minute Order)
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued (N.O.A. 1/28/22; B318270)
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Declaration (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Cros...))
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 03/16/2021)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Deposition)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel (DEPOSITION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Minute Order and continued hearings on demurrer and motion to strike)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Hearings on Demurrer & Motion to Strike By Diane Malcoun)
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Declaration (OF DAVID GILMORE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF ANTHONY BARKETT)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Declaration (OF DAVID M. GILMORE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Notice (APPENDIX OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUD ICATION)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Order (RE: CROSS-DEFENDANTS? DEMURRERS TO LISA BARKETT?S FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) DEMU...))
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL ANT...))
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Notice (EXHIBITS TO SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND ACCOUNTING)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME ...))
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Order ((proposed) Order)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to File Third Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Reply (To Opposition To Motion to Quash Service)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (of JC ISO Reply to Opposition)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons MOTION OF SPECI...))
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Petition
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON STIPULATION TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Status Report (JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION)
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (3rd))
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Declaration (of George Stephan in Support of MSJ Against Lisa Barkett)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Declaration (of George Stephan in Support of MSJ Against William Barkett)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Memorandum (in Support of Motion for Summary Adjudication Against Lisa Barkett)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Jerome H. Friedberg in Support of MSJ Against Lisa Barkett)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Jerome H. Friedberg in Support of MSJ Against William Barkett)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Memorandum (in Support of MSJ Against William Barkett)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference (continued from 03/11/2020)))
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Declaration (of David Gilmore in Opposition to Motion to Compel)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Declaration (of David Gilmore)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Subpoenas served on JP Morgan Chase and Pacific Western Bank)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice (of Minute Order Dated June 23, 2021 and Continuance of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Notice (of Rescheduled Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication Against Lisa Ann Barkett)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION O...))
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Subpoenas served on JP Morgan Chase and Pacific Western Bank)
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/09/2021)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Answer (TO PLAINTIFFS? THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Amended Complaint (SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR MONETARY AND OTHER RELIEF FOR:)
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Amended Complaint (SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR MONETARY AND OTHER RELIEF FOR:)
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Amended Complaint (SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR MONETARY AND OTHER RELIEF FOR:)
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.