Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Perez Felipa, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Fasen Leo, against City Of Gardena, represented by Dumont Louis R., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Laura A. Seigle presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 17, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions100 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Felipa Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Offer to Compromise; Filed by: Felipa Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: City of Gardena (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: City of Gardena (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Response Answer to First Amended Complaint; Filed by: City of Gardena (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Felipa Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Felipa Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Felipa Perez (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Felipa Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Amended Complaint 1st; Filed by: Felipa Perez (Plaintiff); As to: City of Gardena (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Felipa Perez (Plaintiff); As to: City of Gardena (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Offer to Compromise Filed by Felipa Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by City of Gardena (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Felipa Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Felipa Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Response (Answer to First Amended Complaint) Filed by City of Gardena (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Felipa Perez (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Felipa Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by City of Gardena (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Felipa Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: January 14, 2022Amended Complaint (1st) Filed by Felipa Perez (Plaintiff); Felipa Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Complaint (1st) Filed by Felipa Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/21/2020)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Response (Answer to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.