Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lopez Jose Agripino, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Saghian Edwin, against Kocher Nira, represented by Lerman Jeffrey Edward, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Elaine Lu presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 01, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time540 days |
Answer; Filed by: Nira Kocher (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Jose Agripino Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: Nira Kocher (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted; Filed by: Jose Agripino Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: Nira Kocher (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jose Agripino Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: Nira Kocher (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Opposition Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Interrogatories; Filed by: Nira Kocher (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by: Jose Agripino Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: May 26, 2020) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Nira Kocher (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Nira Kocher (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Interrogatories)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: May 26, 2020) of 04/17/2020)
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiff's First Se...))
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: May 29, 2020Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: May 26, 2020))
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Demand for Production of Documents)
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (Not Entered)
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.