Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ould Rouis Ali, Ould Rouis Lou Baya, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Mirch Kevin, Mirch Kevin John, Mirch Marie C, Mirch Marie C., Mirch Marie Claire, (total of 5) See All against Furniture By Thurston Inc., The Regents Of The University Of California, represented by Barber John L., Khosrowpour Alaleh T, Oesterreich Thomas G., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Elizabeth Allen White presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management319 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions319 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Management Statement; Filed by: Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Declaration Lou Baya Ould Rouis; Filed by: Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Declaration of Kevin Mirch; Filed by: Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Declaration Lori Dennis; Filed by: Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 17; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Declaration Grace Gelone; Filed by: Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 19; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 5; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Declaration Kevin Mirch; Filed by: Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Change of Handling Attorney; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 8; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 7; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Declaration of Marie Mirch; Filed by: Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Motions in Limine) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter (Julie Park, CSR #13925); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued NOA: B316495; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Order and Judgment Granting Summary Judgment]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Declaration of Marie Mirch; Filed by: Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Declaration of Mailing; Filed by: Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid paid for Ali & Lou Baya Ould; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Ruling: Demurrer to Complaint and Motion to Strike; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Declaration Ali Ould Rouis; Filed by: Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 16; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 1; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 10; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 2; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Declaration of Marie Mirch; Filed by: Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Continuance of Order to Show Cause) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 18; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine number 2; Filed by: Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 14; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 6; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 15; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 3; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Setting Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Continuance of Order to Show Cause) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Declaration of Non-Service; Filed by: Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Reporter Appeal Transcripts Deposit Paid paid for appellant; Filed by:
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE ENTRY OF DEFAULT) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine Number 1; Filed by: Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 20; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 4; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 9; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 11; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-04T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 13; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 12; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 21; Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Lodging of Exhibits; Filed by: Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-18T00:00:001st Amended Complaint Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st) Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Declaration (of Kevin Mirch) Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 2) Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Motions in Limine) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 14) Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Plai...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Declaration (Grace Gelone) Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Declaration (of Marie Mirch) Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 3) Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Declaration (Lou Baya Ould Rouis) Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 11) Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 5) Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Appearance Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Answer Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 1) Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 7) Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Ruling: Demurrer to Complaint and Motion to Strike Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 21) Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-04T00:00:00Notice (of Status Conference Hearing) Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Change of Handling Attorney Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 13) Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 20) Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Declaration (Kevin Mirch) Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 15) Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 16) Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter ((Julie Park, CSR #13925)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (number 2) Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Exhibits) Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 8) Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript NOA: B316495; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Marie Mirch) Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 6) Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 4) Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Setting Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Declaration (Ali Ould Rouis) Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 17) Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 10) Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 12) Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Number 1) Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial, Final St...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued (NOA: B316495) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Plaintiffs' Motion for L...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Plaintiffs' Motion for L...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Declaration (of Non-Service) Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Continuance of Order to Show Cause)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Taking Non-Appearance Case Review Off-Calendar)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (NOA: B316495) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Order and Judgment Granting Summary Judgment]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE ENTRY OF DEFAULT)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-20T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered Filed by Clerk
Date: November 10, 2022Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Continuance of Order to Show Cause) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid (paid for Ali & Lou Baya Ould) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Continuance of Order to Show Cause)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-20T00:00:00Declaration (of Mailing) Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE ENTRY OF DEFAULT)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-18T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of OSC) Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Continuance of Order to Show Cause) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Order - Dismissal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE ENTRY OF DEFAULT)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued (NOA B316495 REPORTER FEES) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE ENTRY OF DEFAULT) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (CERTIFICATE OF E-SERVICE)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 21)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 7)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 9)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Zachariah Newswanger)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Setting Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Taking Non-Appearance Case Review Off-Calendar) of )
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Taking Non-Appearance Case Review Off-Calendar))
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Marie Mirch in Support of Plaintiffs? Motions in Limine No 1 and 2)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 16)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Declaration (Kevin Mirch)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Ruling: Demurrer to Complaint and Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Response (Plaintiffs' Amended Response to Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Declaration (of Marie Mirch in Support of Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 10)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 18)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Declaration (Lori Dennis)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No 3)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Declaration (Ali Ould Rouis)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Change of Handling Attorney
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No 2)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Response (Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Seperate Statement of Undisputed Facts)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Declaration (of Marie Mirch in Support of to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 5)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Declaration (Grace Gelone)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Notice (DEFENDANT THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA'S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Number 1)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2020-06-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 10)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial, Final St...) of )
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Plai...))
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Marie Mirch)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Kevin Mirch)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 11)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Response (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 16)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 4)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:001st Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff The Regents of the University of California Demurrer to Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant The Regents of the University of California's Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 15)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 17)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Declaration (Lou Baya Ould Rouis)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 20)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Exhibits)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Status Report (UPDATED JOINT REPORT FOR CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING)
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 12)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 2)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 5)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 11)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 6)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 18)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 17)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 19)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 14)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 9)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Continuing Hearing on Demurrer with Motion to Str...))
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 20)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial, Final St...))
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 13)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 10)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 14)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Declaration (Kevin Mirch with exhibits)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 4)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Setting Non-Appearance Case Review) of )
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Response (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 8)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Order ([Proposed] Order and Judgment Granting Summary Judgment)
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No 1)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Reply (PLAINTIFFS? REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment to Department 48)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Status Report (JOINT REPORT FOR STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Declaration (of Marie Mirch)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter ((Julie Park, CSR #13925))
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (Complaint to Name DOE Defendants 1 and 2)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 21)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Motions in Limine) of )
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 5)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Marie Mirch)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine (number 2)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading to Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 13)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 6)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 12)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Notice (of Status Conference Hearing)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 19)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 7)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 1)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 3)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 15)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Reply (PLAINTIFFS? REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of )
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Notice (Defendant The Regents of the University of California's Notice of Unavailability of Counsel)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Motions in Limine))
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE MOTION TO STRIKE OR TO TAX COSTS)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- ("Respondent")
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Plaintiffs' Motion for L...))
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs) of )
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (Certificate of Service)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued (NOA: B316495)
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Tax Costs)
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (NOA: B316495)
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs))
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment (/ Default Rejected)
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Plaintiffs' Motion for L...))
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF MARIE MIRCH RE SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading to Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Continuing Hearing on Demurrer with Motion to Str...))
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant The Regents of the University of California's Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff The Regents of the University of California Demurrer to Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Motions in Limine)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 19) Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 9) Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 18) Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Setting Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Continuing Hearing on Demurrer with Motion to Str...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Marie Mirch) Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Declaration (Lori Dennis) Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by The Regents of the University of California (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Lou Baya Ould Rouis (Plaintiff); Ali Ould Rouis (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Notice (DEFENDANT THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA'S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Plai...))
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment to Department 48)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Status Report (JOINT REPORT FOR STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial, Final St...))
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Notice (of Status Conference Hearing)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Status Report (UPDATED JOINT REPORT FOR CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING)
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Motion in Limine (number 2)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Declaration (of Kevin Mirch)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Number 1)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Declaration (Lori Dennis)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Zachariah Newswanger)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Declaration (Ali Ould Rouis)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Declaration (Lou Baya Ould Rouis)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Declaration (Kevin Mirch)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Declaration (Grace Gelone)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Response (Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Seperate Statement of Undisputed Facts)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (CERTIFICATE OF E-SERVICE)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Declaration (Ali Ould Roius (Errata))
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Declaration (Kevin Mirch with exhibits)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Exhibits)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 5)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 21)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 2)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 6)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 3)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 1)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 4)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 20)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 19)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 15)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 16)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 17)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 18)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 9)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 13)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 11)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 14)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 8)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 10)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 12)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 7)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Response (Plaintiffs' Amended Response to Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Declaration (of Marie Mirch)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Declaration (of Marie Mirch)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 18)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 14)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 13)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Declaration (of Marie Mirch in Support of to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 5)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 12)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Response (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 16)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 20)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 21)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Declaration (of Marie Mirch in Support of Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 10)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 17)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 11)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 10)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 9)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No 2)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No 3)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No 1)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 7)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Response (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 8)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 19)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 4)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 6)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 15)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Motions in Limine) of 10/27/2021)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter ((Julie Park, CSR #13925))
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 5)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Marie Mirch in Support of Plaintiffs? Motions in Limine No 1 and 2)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Motions in Limine))
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Reply (PLAINTIFFS? REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Reply (PLAINTIFFS? REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 11/01/2021)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (Complaint to Name DOE Defendants 1 and 2)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Declaration (of Marie Mirch)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Notice (Defendant The Regents of the University of California's Notice of Unavailability of Counsel)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Order ([Proposed] Order and Judgment Granting Summary Judgment)
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Setting Non-Appearance Case Review) of 11/19/2021)
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF MARIE MIRCH RE SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE MOTION TO STRIKE OR TO TAX COSTS)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Setting Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Taking Non-Appearance Case Review Off-Calendar))
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Plaintiffs' Motion for L...))
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued (NOA: 11/02/21 B316495)
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Plaintiffs' Motion for L...))
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 ("Respondent")
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (Certificate of Service)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (NOA: 11/02/21 B316495)
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 8)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Declaration (Ali Ould Roius (Errata))
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.