Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Glaspie Tinatra Brittany, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Yashar Nadia, against Fca Us Llc, Huntington Beach Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, represented by Schirm Barry, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Richard J. Burdge Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management160 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Tinatra Brittany Glaspie (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: FCA US LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Tinatra Brittany Glaspie (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Post-Mediation Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: FCA US LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Huntington Beach Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Tinatra Brittany Glaspie (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Tinatra Brittany Glaspie (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: FCA US LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Updated -- Motion to Tax Costs: Filed By: FCA US LLC (Defendant); Result: Withdrawn; Result Date:
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Tinatra Brittany Glaspie (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Declaration (of Nadia Yashar Regarding Time Change for Case Management Hearing on May 13, 2019)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Attendance of PMK for FCA US LLC)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees))
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney 's Fees)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Post-Mediation Status Conference) of 01/29/2020)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismi...))
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.