Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Williams Ronald, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mendoza Carlos Francisco Esq., against Case Melanie, represented by Muench Richard Arthur Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Georgina T. Rizk presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 28, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: COVID-19;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Melanie Case (Defendant); As to: Ronald Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Melanie Case (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Ronald Williams (Plaintiff); As to: Melanie Case (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ronald Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Melanie Case (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Ronald Williams (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Ronald Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Ronald Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: COVID-19;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Ronald Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: COVID-19;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Melanie Case (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant's Further D...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Melanie Case (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Answer Filed by Melanie Case (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: COVID-19;))
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: COVID-19;) of 04/02/2020)
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant's Further D...))
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/15/2020)
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.