Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jobs To Move America, State Of California; Los Angeles Metropolitan Transportation Authority, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Alkhatib Shifa, Brennan Cecilia, Jensen Rachel, More Paul L., Yan Ivy Z., (total of 6) See All against New Flyer Of America Inc., represented by Dougherty Eugene Paul Jr, Dougherty Eugene P. Jr, Gatto Brian Del, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Theresa M. Traber presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 27, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: New Flyer of America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Request FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER; Filed by: New Flyer of America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Declaration of Craig Mosby; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Opposition Relator's Opposition to New Flyer's Demurrer; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Declaration of Paul More; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Declaration of Mario Avila; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Declaration of Debbie Pitts; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: New Flyer of America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Opposition Opposition to New Flyer's Motion to Strike; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: New Flyer of America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Declaration of Madeline Janis; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Declaration OFMARIO AVILA; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: New Flyer of America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: New Flyer of America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Response to Separate Statement; Filed by: New Flyer of America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Declaration of Eric Martinez; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Declaration of Jeffrey Lacher; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Declaration OF MADELINE JANIS; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Declaration of Pam Grushka; Filed by: New Flyer of America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: New Flyer of America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: New Flyer of America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 5: To Bar Improper Expert Testimony; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: New Flyer of America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Brief Exhibits to the Declaration of Paul More; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Declaration of Debra Avila; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Declaration of Marcel Hunt; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Jury Question; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Declaration of John R Danos; Filed by: New Flyer of America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Reply IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4; Filed by: New Flyer of America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Declaration OF JEFFREY LACHER; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Declaration OF DEBRA AVILA; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Declaration OF DEBBIE PITTS; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Jury Instructions JOINT LIST OF PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Declaration of Ricky Lawrence; Filed by: New Flyer of America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Declaration OF CRAIG MOSBY; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Declaration OFMARIO AVILA; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Declaration of Steven Young; Filed by: New Flyer of America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 1: To Limit Trial to Triable Issues; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: New Flyer of America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Declaration OF ERIC MARTINEZ; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Declaration OF KATHERINE PIERRE; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss; Filed by: New Flyer of America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by: New Flyer of America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Witness List JOINT WITNESS LIST; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Jury Instructions AMENDED JOINT PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Reply IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3; Filed by: New Flyer of America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Reply IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1; Filed by: New Flyer of America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: New Flyer of America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Statement of the Case JOINT STATEMENT OF THE CASE; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Ruling-Demurrer / Motion to Strike; Filed by: Clerk; As to: New Flyer of America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: New Flyer of America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: New Flyer of America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Paul L. More (Attorney)
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (COURT ORDER:) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (COURT ORDER:) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Confidential Cover Sheet False Claims Action
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Order (Lifting the Seal as to Certain Documents)
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00State of California's Notice of Declination
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for order lifting the seal as to certain documents)
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (and Proposed Order to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Meet and Confer Efforts in Support of Demurrer and Motion)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Notice (of Federal and Non-California Authorities in Support of Demurrer)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/09/2020)
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (re Good Cause for Late Filing of Briefs)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to New Flyer's Motion to Strike)
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Opposition (Relator's Opposition to New Flyer's Demurrer)
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (AMENDED MINUTE ORDER))
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Reply (in support of Motion to Strike portions of Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion...))
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Reply (in support of Demurrer to Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Brief (SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT NKW FLYER OF AMERICA INC. TO COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion...))
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Declaration (OF JEFFREY LACHER)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Declaration (OF DEBRA AVILA)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Declaration (OF MADELINE JANIS)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Declaration (OF CRAIG MOSBY)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Declaration (OFMARIO AVILA)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Declaration (OF DEBBIE PITTS)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Declaration (OF PAUL MORE)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Declaration (OF MARCEL HUNT)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Declaration (OF ERIC MARTINEZ)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Jennifer McNeill)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Response (to Separate Statement)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Ricky Lawrence)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Pam Grushka)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Declaration (of John R Danos)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Steven Young)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Reply in support of Demurrer to Complaint; Filed by: New Flyer of America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Declaration of Paul More in support of MSJ; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Declaration OF MARCEL HUNT; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Motion to Bifurcate; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Declaration of Jennifer McNeill; Filed by: New Flyer of America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Declaration OF PAUL MORE; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Exhibit List AMENDED JOINT; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: Jobs to Move America (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Hearing on Motion for...))
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC): POST-MEDIATION STATUS C...))
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Request (QUI TAM PLAINTIFF JOBS TO MOVE AMERICAS REQUESTS TO STREAMLINE AND BIFURCATE TRIAL PROCEEDINGS)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (To Extend Time For Exchange of Expert Information)
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTERS: (1) MOTION BY DEFENDANT (NEW FL...))
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Appearance (ON BEHALF OF QUI TAM PLAINTIFF JOBS TO MOVE AMERICA)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Motion to Bifurcate
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Opposition (to New Flyers Ex Parte Application too Continue Trial)
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial and All Trial-Related Deadlines)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Ruling-Demurrer / Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Appearance (ON BEHALF OF RELATOR JOBS TO MOVE AMERICA COALITION)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Request (FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Craig Mosby)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Brief (Exhibits to the Declaration of Paul More)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Debbie Pitts)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Eric Martinez)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Debra Avila)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Declaration (OFMARIO AVILA)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Madeline Janis)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Marcel Hunt)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Mario Avila)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Paul More)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Jeffrey Lacher)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 47 Non-Appearance Case Review (to determine if pro hac vice counsel, Brian Del Gatto (counsel for defendant New Flyer of America, Inc.) has paid the annual renewal fee per Government Code Section 70617(e)(2)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Non-Appearance Case Review (to determine if pro hac vice counsel, Brian Del Gatto (counsel for defendant New Flyer of America, Inc.) has paid the annual renewal fee per Government Code Section 70617(e)(2)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 47 Non-Appearance Case Review (to determine if pro hac vice counsel, Shifa Alkhatib (counsel for Qui Tam Plaintiff, and Relator Jobs to Move America) has paid the annual renewal fee per Government Code Section 70617(e)(2)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Non-Appearance Case Review (to determine if pro hac vice counsel, Shifa Alkhatib (counsel for Qui Tam Plaintiff, and Relator Jobs to Move America) has paid the annual renewal fee per Government Code Section 70617(e)(2)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 47 Hearing on Motion to Dismiss - Not Held - Vacated by Court Hearing on Motion to Dismiss - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- STIPULATED REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT, DISMISSAL OF ACTION, AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUING JURISDICTION: Name Extension: blank; Exact Name: STIPULATED REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT, DISMISSAL OF ACTION, AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUING JURISDICTION; As To Parties: removed | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- STIPULATED REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT, DISMISSAL OF ACTION, AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUING JURISDICTION: As To Parties: removed | |
June 24, 2022 | Hearing | Non-Appearance Case Review to determine if pro hac vice counsel, Brian Del Gatto (counsel for defendant New Flyer of America, Inc.) has paid the annual renewal fee per Government Code Section 70617(e)(2) scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 47 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | The case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Entire Action/Case | |
June 24, 2022 | Hearing | Pursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Dismiss scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 47 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
June 24, 2022 | Hearing | Non-Appearance Case Review to determine if pro hac vice counsel, Shifa Alkhatib (counsel for Qui Tam Plaintiff, and Relator Jobs to Move America) has paid the annual renewal fee per Government Code Section 70617(e)(2) scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 47 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Order APPROVING SETTLEMENT, DISMISSING ACTION, ENTERING JUDGMENT AND RETAINING CONTINUING JURISDICTION: As To Parties changed from New Flyer of America, Inc. (Defendant) to New Flyer of America, Inc. (Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.