Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Briones David, Briones Irene, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mikhov Steve Borislav, against Fca Us Llc, San Fernando Motor Company Dba Rydell Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, represented by Kuenster Jennifer A., Livedalen Kristi Jean, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Monica Bachner presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management146 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 15, 2018 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: David Briones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: David Briones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: David Briones (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: San Fernando Motor Company, a California Corporation, (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by: David Briones (Plaintiff); Irene Briones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: FCA US LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: David Briones (Plaintiff); Irene Briones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: FCA US LLC (Defendant); San Fernando Motor Company (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Declaration of KL ISO Opposition to Motion to Compel; Filed by: FCA US LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: FCA US LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: David Briones (Plaintiff); Irene Briones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: David Briones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: David Briones (Plaintiff); Irene Briones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of , Ruling on Submitted Matter; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Ruling on Submitted Matter; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine NO. 3 ATTORNEYS' FEES; Filed by: David Briones (Plaintiff); Irene Briones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: David Briones (Plaintiff); Irene Briones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Complaint Filed by David Briones (Plaintiff); Irene Briones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Answer Filed by San Fernando Motor Company (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Answer Filed by FCA US LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by David Briones (Plaintiff); Irene Briones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by David Briones (Plaintiff); Irene Briones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by David Briones (Plaintiff); Irene Briones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Declaration (of KL ISO Opposition to Motion to Compel) Filed by FCA US LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by David Briones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by FCA US LLC (Defendant); San Fernando Motor Company (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by David Briones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference) Filed by David Briones (Plaintiff); Irene Briones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by FCA US LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury Filed by David Briones (Plaintiff); Irene Briones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by David Briones (Plaintiff); Irene Briones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Ruling Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Judgement) Filed by David Briones (Plaintiff); Irene Briones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by FCA US LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by FCA US LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Notice ( of Entry of Order) Filed by David Briones (Plaintiff); Irene Briones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Motion of Plaintiff, David Briones, to Compel Further Respons...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by FCA US LLC (Defendant); San Fernando Motor Company (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by David Briones (Plaintiff); Irene Briones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication Filed by FCA US LLC (Defendant); San Fernando Motor Company (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by David Briones (Plaintiff); Irene Briones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of , Ruling on Submitted Matter) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by David Briones (Plaintiff); Irene Briones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by David Briones (Plaintiff); Irene Briones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Motion of Defendants, FCA US LLC and San Fernando Motor Compa...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Ruling on Submitted Matter Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by David Briones (Plaintiff); Irene Briones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: COVID-19 continuances;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 3 ATTORNEYS' FEES) Filed by David Briones (Plaintiff); Irene Briones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees Filed by David Briones (Plaintiff); Irene Briones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: COVID-19 continuances;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs Filed by FCA US LLC (Defendant); San Fernando Motor Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by David Briones (Plaintiff); Irene Briones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Motion of Plaintiffs, David Briones and Irene Briones, for At...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Ruling Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by David Briones (Plaintiff); Irene Briones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Motion of Plaintiffs, David Briones and Irene Briones, for At...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE))
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Declaration (of KL ISO Opposition to Motion to Compel)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Jeanette Suarez ISO Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Declaration (of Jeff Richards ISO Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents (Set One)
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Ruling
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Judgement)
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Motion of Plaintiff, David Briones, to Compel Further Respons...))
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Notice ( of Entry of Order)
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/20/2020)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Notice of Motion (PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Reply ( To Plaintiffs? Opposition To Motion For Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Motion of Defendants, FCA US LLC and San Fernando Motor Compa...))
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 03/05/2020, Ruling on Submitted Matter)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 7 to Exclude Evidence or Argument that the Implied Warranty was Disclaimed)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 3 ATTORNEYS' FEES)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 5 to Exclude Reference to Plaintiffs' Financial Condition)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 6 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO ATTORNEY ADVERTISING)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 2 To Exclude Any Evidence Of Alleged Nonconformities Not Presented)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 1 to Exclude Opinions as to the Applicability of Warranty Coverage)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 4 to Exclude Reference to Any Previous Settlement Negotiations)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 2 to Exclude Argument of Misuse, Abuse and Neglect)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 8 to Exclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Hypothetical Fixes)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 15 to Exclude Expert Opinions From Non-Designated Experts)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 14 to Exclude Non-Party Witnesses from the Courtroom)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Motion of Plaintiffs, David Briones and Irene Briones, for At...))
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/25/2020)
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANTS? REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TAX COSTS)
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Motion of Plaintiffs, David Briones and Irene Briones, for At...))
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Reply ([PLAINTIFFS?] TO DEFENDANTS? OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS? FEES)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Ruling
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/25/2021)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Opposition (DEFENDANTS? OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR ATTORNEY?S FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/18/2020)
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: COVID-19 continuances;) of 04/15/2020)
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: COVID-19 continuances;))
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/09/2021)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: COVID-19 continuances;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: David Briones (Plaintiff); Irene Briones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: FCA US LLC (Defendant); San Fernando Motor Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: David Briones (Plaintiff); Irene Briones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.