Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Abrams Artists Agency, Panaro Dean, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Price Dylan John, against Kazarian Measures Ruskin & Associates Inc., Panaro Dean, represented by Mcrae Devin Alexander, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Stephanie M. Bowick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephanie M. Bowick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management143 days |
Filing DateOctober 22, 2018 |
CategoryTortious Interference (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time310 days |
Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: October 22, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 22, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: November 07, 2018Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint (First)
Date: January 15, 2019Answer
Date: November 28, 2018Answer
Date: February 11, 2019Cross-Complaint
Date: February 11, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: February 11, 2019Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 02/26/2019
Date: February 26, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)
Date: February 26, 2019Other - - Other - FURTHER ORDER RE: STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: February 26, 2019Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: February 27, 2019Request for Refund / Order
Date: February 27, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: February 27, 2019Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: February 28, 2019Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: March 13, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: March 14, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 26, 2019Separate Statement
Date: March 26, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 26, 2019Separate Statement
Date: April 30, 2019Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES
Date: April 30, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING
Date: June 05, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: August 27, 2019Answer (to Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Further Responses)
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Summons (on Amended Complaint (1st))
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 02/26/2019)
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Complaint (for Breach Contract)
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((First))
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Other - (FURTHER ORDER RE: STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER)
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Hearing)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: August 27, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.