Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Phipps Linda, Phipps William, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Barrow Brian Patrick, Beirne Peter Christopher, against Ajax Boiler & Heater Co., Baltimore Aircoil Company, Carrier Corporation, Cbs Corporation Fka Viacom Fka Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Copeland Access Inc., (total of 30) See All represented by Anderson Knight Esq., Bernard Randall Keith, Brosamle Anthony Dean, Campagne Ingrid Kristin, Duffy Joseph, (total of 22) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with David S. Cunningham presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 23, 2018 |
CategoryAsbestos- Personal Injury/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 26, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 26, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBERT J. BUGATTO
Date: March 27, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 27, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF ELLEN R. HURLEY
Date: March 27, 2019Separate Statement
Date: March 27, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: March 27, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: April 04, 2019Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED
Date: April 16, 2019Other - - OTHER - LIST OF PROPOSED FORMER TESTIMONY
Date: April 19, 2019Statement of the Case - STATEMENT OF THE CASE - PROPOSED
Date: April 19, 2019Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS - PROPOSED CACI
Date: April 19, 2019Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE USE OF VISUAL DISPLAYS AT TRIAL
Date: April 19, 2019Other - - OTHER - DEFENDANT FAMILIAN CORP'S LIST OF FORMER TESTIMONY
Date: April 19, 2019Other - - DEFENDANT COPELAND CORPORATION LLC'S LIST OF FORMER TESTIMONY
Date: April 22, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL
Date: April 22, 2019Notice of Ruling - (AMENDED)
Date: April 23, 2019Other - - OTHER - PLAINTIFFS' FORMER LIST OF TESTIMONY
Date: April 23, 2019Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS - [PROPOSED] SPECIAL
Date: April 24, 2019Joinder to Motion - JOINDER TO MOTION IN LIMINES
Date: April 26, 2019Other - - (AMENDED)
Date: April 26, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: April 29, 2019Objection - OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FORMER LIST OF TESTIMONY
Date: April 29, 2019Objection - OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE TO APPEAR AND PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AT TRIAL
Date: April 29, 2019Objection - OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FORMER LIST OF TESTIMONY
Date: April 30, 2019Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST - TRIAL
Date: May 01, 2019Witness List - WITNESS LIST - TRIAL
Date: May 01, 2019Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST FOR USE AT TRIAL - PROPOSED
Date: May 01, 2019Witness List - WITNESS LIST - PROPOSED TRIAL
Date: May 01, 2019Application - APPLICATION OF JON B. ORNDORFF FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE
Date: May 02, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 03, 2019Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED
Date: May 03, 2019Witness List - WITNESS LIST - (PROPOSED) SECOND AMENDED JOINT
Date: May 03, 2019Witness List - WITNESS LIST - (PROPOSED) JOINT
Date: May 03, 2019Trial Brief - DEFENDANT FAMILIAN CORP'S TRIAL BRIEF
Date: May 03, 2019Statement of the Case - STATEMENT OF THE CASE - JOINT [PROPOSED]
Date: May 03, 2019Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST - JOINT
Date: May 03, 2019Reply - REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: May 03, 2019Reply - REPLY TO SEPARATE STATEMENT
Date: May 03, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MIL NO. 28
Date: May 03, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MIL NO. 25
Date: May 03, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MIL NO. 11
Date: May 03, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MIL NO. 21
Date: May 03, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MIL NO. 47
Date: May 03, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MIL NO. 19
Date: May 03, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MIL NO. 1
Date: May 03, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MIL NO. 4
Date: May 03, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MIL NO. 46
Date: May 03, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MIL NO. 39
Date: May 03, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MIL NO. 41
Date: May 03, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MIL NO. 34
Date: May 03, 2019Witness List - (AMENDED)
Date: May 03, 2019Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS
Date: May 03, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MIL NO. 7
Date: May 03, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MIL NO. 3
Date: May 03, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MIL NO. 2
Date: May 03, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 - JOINT
Date: May 03, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF JAMIE O. NORMAN
Date: May 03, 2019Statement of the Case - STATEMENT OF THE CASE - [PROPOSED] JOINT
Date: May 08, 2019Witness List - (AMENDED)
Date: May 08, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING OFF CALENDAR
Date: May 09, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MSJ/MSA OFF CALENDAR
Date: May 09, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF PARTIAL RESOLUTION OF MATTER
Date: May 09, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: May 09, 2019Other - - RULINGS ON PAGE-LINE OBJECTIONS (PART I)
Date: May 29, 2019Other - - RULINGS ON PAGE-LINE OBJECTIONS (PART VI B)
Date: May 31, 2019Other - - RULINGS ON PAGE-LINE OBJECTIONS (PART II)
Date: May 31, 2019Other - - RULINGS ON PAGE-LINE OBJECTIONS (PART IV)
Date: May 31, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL (RE PHIPPS-18STCV02021))
Date: May 31, 2019Notice of Ruling - DEFENSE MIL INDEX WITH RULING AND COMMENTS
Date: May 31, 2019Other - - RULINGS ON PAGE-LINE OBJECTIONS (PART III)
Date: May 31, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: June 06, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: June 10, 2019Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE DEFENSE MOTIONS IN LIMINE
Date: June 11, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: June 11, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: June 12, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: June 13, 2019Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: June 13, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: June 14, 2019Objection - OBJECTION TO PROPOSED JUDGMENT ON VERDICT
Date: July 02, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CONFERENCE (TELEPHONIC))
Date: July 11, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: July 12, 2019Judgment - JUDGMENT ON VERDICT
Date: July 11, 2019Other - - OTHER - BALTIMORE AIRCOIL COMPANY'S WITHDRAWAL OF MEMORANDUM OF COSTS
Date: July 16, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION
Date: July 16, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: July 16, 2019Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) (AMENDED)
Date: July 19, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR...)
Date: September 17, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: September 20, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 18, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: June 22, 2022Answer; Filed by: Keenan Properties, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Hill Brothers Chemical Company (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: William Phipps (Plaintiff); As to: The J.C. Penny Company (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Carrier Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: United Refrigeration (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: New Coleman Holdings (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Westburne Supply, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: J.C. Penney Corporation Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: William Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Trane USA (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Copeland Corporation, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-18T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Metalclad Insulation Corp. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: York International Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: CBS Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: The Vons Company, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: CBS Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Elements Chemicals Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Familian Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Linda Phipps (Plaintiff); As to: New Coleman Holdings (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: William Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Declaration of Harrison S. Smith; Filed by: J.C. Penney Corporation Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Trial Setting Order; Signed and Filed by: William Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Notice of Rulings at further Status Conference; Filed by: William Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Carrier Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Declaration of Ellen R. Hurley; Filed by: Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: Carrier Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Declaration of Sheldon H. Rabinovitz; Filed by: Copeland Corporation, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: William Phipps (Plaintiff); As to: Ajax Boiler & Heater Co. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Not Entered; Filed by: William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Carrier Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Copeland Corporation, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Opposition to MIL No. 7; Filed by: William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Opposition to MIL No. 25; Filed by: William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Statement of the Case - Proposed; Filed by: Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Exhibit List for use at Trial - Proposed; Filed by: Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Opposition to MIL No. 19; Filed by: William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Exhibit List - Joint; Filed by: William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Statement of the Case - Joint [Proposed]; Filed by: Trane U.S. Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Exhibit List - Trial; Filed by: Carrier Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Opposition to MIL No. 4; Filed by: William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: J.C. Penney Corporation Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: J.C. Penney Corporation Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Opposition to MIL No. 21; Filed by: William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Opposition to MIL No. 2; Filed by: William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Opposition to MIL No. 47; Filed by: William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Opposition to MIL No. 11; Filed by: William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part VI B); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Proof of Service; Filed by: Copeland Corporation, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Declaration of Robert D. Castillo; Filed by: Carrier Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Trial Brief Regarding Bankruptcy Claim Forms; Filed by: Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by: William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Opposition to MIL No. 28; Filed by: William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Opposition to MIL No. 41; Filed by: William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Keenan Properties, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Objection to Plaintiffs' Amended former List of Testimony; Filed by: Trane U.S. Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Declaration of Robert J. Bugatto; Filed by: SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: Baltimore Aircoil Company (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Opposition to MIL No. 3; Filed by: William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Witness List - Proposed Trial; Filed by: Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Copeland Corporation, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: May 16, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 17, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL (RE PHIPPS-18STCV02021))
Date: May 28, 2019Other - - RULINGS ON PAGE-LINE OBJECTIONS (PART VI A)
Date: May 31, 2019Notice of Ruling - RULINGS ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE
Date: May 31, 2019Other - - RULINGS ON PAGE-LINE OBJECTIONS (PART V)
Date: May 31, 2019Trial Brief - TRIAL BRIEF - SUPPLEMENTAL
Date: June 03, 2019Stipulation Re: Jury (Civil Trials)
Date: June 04, 2019Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: June 04, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL (RE PHIPPS-18STCV02021))
Date: June 04, 2019Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: June 04, 2019Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: June 04, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: June 05, 2019Other - - OTHER - COURT'S RULINGS ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE
Date: June 05, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: June 05, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: June 05, 2019Trial Brief - TRIAL BRIEF REGARDING BANKRUPTCY CLAIM FORMS
Date: June 14, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: June 18, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: June 19, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: June 20, 2019Special Verdict
Date: June 21, 2019Jury Question
Date: June 21, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: June 21, 2019Jury Instructions
Date: June 21, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: June 24, 2019Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: June 21, 2019Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: June 27, 2019Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: July 25, 2019Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial
Date: July 29, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: August 01, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: August 08, 2019Motion for New Trial
Date: August 08, 2019Other - - COMPENDIUM OF TRIAL TRANSCRIPT EXCERPTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: August 08, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: August 14, 2019Association of Attorney
Date: August 15, 2019Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/16/2019
Date: August 16, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT COPELAND MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: August 19, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: August 16, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRIAN P. BARROW IN OPPOSITION
Date: August 19, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRIAN P. BARROW
Date: August 19, 2019Objection - OBJECTION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTION OF THE DECLARATIONS
Date: August 19, 2019Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/28/2019
Date: August 28, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: August 28, 2019Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: August 29, 2019Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: September 04, 2019Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: September 10, 2019Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: September 10, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL; HEARING ON MOTION TO TAX COSTS)
Date: September 10, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO TAX COSTS)
Date: September 17, 2019Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: September 17, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: September 18, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: September 24, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: September 25, 2019Other - - OTHER - COURT'S RULING ON MOTION TO TAX/STRIKE
Date: September 24, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: September 25, 2019Undertaking
Date: October 15, 2019Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: October 29, 2019Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript - (AMENDED)
Date: January 16, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: January 17, 2020Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: January 31, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: March 04, 2020Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: November 02, 2020Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: January 20, 2021Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - AFFIRMED B302627
Date: August 13, 2021Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: September 08, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: August 31, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF MELANIE L. AMEELE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: September 16, 2021Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: Copeland Corporation, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Affidavit for Rlse Funds/Req for Payment Rptr Appeal Trnscpt; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Other - Defendant Familian Corp's List of Former Testimony; Filed by: Familian Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial; Filed by: Copeland Corporation, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Jury Instructions - CACI; Filed by:
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Reply to Plaintiffs' evidentiary objections; Filed by: Elements Chemicals Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Witness List - (Proposed) Second Amended Joint; Filed by: Trane U.S. Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Answer Filed by CBS Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Appeal - Opinion Received B302627; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by J.C. Penney Corporation Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Answer Filed by Copeland Corporation, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference (Re: Phipps-18STCV02021))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Opposition (to MIL No. 7) Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Declaration (of Robert D. Castillo) Filed by Carrier Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (Re: Phipps-18STCV02021); Hearing on Motion for Su...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Opposition (to MIL No. 25) Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (Not Entered) Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by Michael Joseph Estrada (Attorney)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Witness List (- Proposed Trial) Filed by Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: William Phipps (Plaintiff); As to: Johnson Controls, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Declaration (In Support of Motion For New Trial) Filed by Copeland Corporation, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Trial Brief (Regarding Bankruptcy Claim Forms) Filed by Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) ((Amended)) Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Judgment (on Verdict) Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by Brian Patrick Barrow (Attorney)
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Declaration of P. Casey Mathews; Filed by: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings for Temporary Stay on Enforcement of Jud...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Motion for New Trial Filed by Copeland Corporation, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Jury Question Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Declaration of Robert D. Castillo; Filed by: Carrier Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed by Ferguson Enterprises Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial Filed by Copeland Corporation, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Objection (To Proposed Judgment On Verdict) Filed by Copeland Corporation, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Other - Court's Ruling on Motion to Tax/Strike; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) "U0"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Declaration Of Brian P. Barrow; Filed by: William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion to Strike; Filed by: Copeland Corporation, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Keenan Properties, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Complaint Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed B302627; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of , Copy of Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Declaration In Support of Motion For New Trial; Filed by: Copeland Corporation, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Exhibit List (- Trial) Filed by Familian Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Court Order)]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Declaration of T. Eric Sun; Filed by: Copeland Corporation, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Commission to Take Deposition Outside California Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by Copeland Corporation, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Jury Instructions - Proposed CACI; Filed by:
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Grinnell LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Baltimore Aircoil Company (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Other - List of Proposed Former Testimony; Filed by: Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: The Vons Company, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Trial Brief (- Supplemental) Filed by Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiffs' evidence with [Proposed] rulings) Filed by The Vons Company, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Witness List (- (Proposed) Third Amended Joint) Filed by Trane U.S. Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part II) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Opposition (to MIL No. 2) Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Other - (Court's Rulings on Motions in Limine) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Request for Refund of Reporter Appeal Transcript Deposit; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (With Prejudice) Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Amended Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript "U0" NOA B302627; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Declaration (Of Brian P. Barrow) Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: June 22, 2022Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript JCCP4674 "U0" NOA B302627; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: J.C. Penney Corporation Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Answer Filed by United Refrigeration (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by The Vons Company, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by CBS Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Answer Filed by Trane USA (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Answer Filed by Hill Brothers Chemical Company (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Answer Filed by Baltimore Aircoil Company (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Answer Filed by The Vons Company, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application Filed by Carrier Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Answer Filed by Elementis Chemicals Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Carrier Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Robert D. Castillo) Filed by Carrier Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Trial Setting Order Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Answer Filed by New Coleman Holdings (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (Not Entered) Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Other - (Defendant Familian Corp's List of Former Testimony) Filed by Familian Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Witness List (- (Proposed) Joint) Filed by Trane U.S. Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Defendant Familian Corp's Trial Brief Filed by Familian Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Witness List (- Trial) Filed by Familian Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Notice (of taking its Motion For Summary Judgment) Filed by SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Notice (of Partial Resolution of Matter) Filed by Carrier Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Motion For Summary Judgment off calendar) Filed by Keenan Properties, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Opposition (to MIL No. 41) Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (Re Phipps-18STCV02021))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Opposition (to MIL No. 34) Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part III) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Statement of the Case (- [Proposed] Joint) Filed by Trane U.S. Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiffs' Amended former List of Testimony) Filed by Trane U.S. Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Opposition (to MIL No. 1) Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Declaration (of Jamie O. Norman) Filed by Baltimore Aircoil Company (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiffs' evidentiary objections) Filed by Elementis Chemicals Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Opposition (to MIL No. 9) Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Conference (Telephonic))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (With Prejudice) Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for New Trial; Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed by Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of , Copy of Judgment) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed by J.C. Penney Corporation Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed by Keenan Properties, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Notice to Reporter to Prepare Transcript on Appeal (JCCP4674 "U0" NOA B302627) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Strike) Filed by Copeland Corporation, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Notice (of entry of Judgment or Order) Filed by Copeland Corporation, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Appellate Order Extending Time for Reporter Transcript Prep (NOA: B302627) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Notice to Reporter to Prepare Transcript on Appeal (JCCP4674 "U0" NOA B302627) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- (JCCP4674 "U0") Filed by Copeland Corporation, LLC (Appellant)
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) ("U0") Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed (B302627) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Carrier Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Joinder to Motion In Limines; Filed by: Baltimore Aircoil Company (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: Copeland Corporation, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Motion for New Trial; Filed by: Copeland Corporation, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Answer Filed by Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Declaration (of T. Eric Sun) Filed by Copeland Corporation, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Jury Instructions - [Proposed] Special; Filed by:
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference (Re: Phipps-18STCV02021))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Answer Filed by Westburne Supply, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Taking Off Calendar; Filed by:
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Exhibit List - Amended; Filed by: Copeland Corporation, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Amended Witness List (Proposed) Joint; Filed by: Trane U.S. Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Answer Filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Declaration (of P. Casey Mathews) Filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Peter Christopher Beirne (Attorney); William Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Answer Filed by Grinnell LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Rulings at further Status Conference Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Declaration (of Ellen R. Hurley) Filed by Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Robert J. Bugatto) Filed by SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: William Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Opposition to MIL No. 9; Filed by: William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Statement of the Case - [Proposed] Joint; Filed by: Trane U.S. Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Opposition to MIL No. 39; Filed by: William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Opposition to MIL No. 31; Filed by: William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Witness List - Trial; Filed by: Familian Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Opposition to MIL No. 34; Filed by: William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Motion for Preference Pursuant to CCP 36(a), 36(d) and 36(e) Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-18T00:00:00Answer Filed by York International Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by The Vons Company, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Re Defense Motions in Limine; Filed by: Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Amended Witness List - (Proposed) Third Amended Joint; Filed by: Trane U.S. Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Sheldon H. Rabinovitz) Filed by Copeland Corporation, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part III); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part II); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Defense MIL Index with Ruling and Comments; Filed by: Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication Filed by Copeland Corporation, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Copeland Corporation, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Answer Filed by J.C. Penney Corporation Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Objection To Proposed Judgment On Verdict; Filed by: Copeland Corporation, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Declaration (of Harrison S. Smith) Filed by J.C. Penney Corporation Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) (Re Phipps-18STCV02021))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Opposition to Motion In Limine No. 2 - Joint; Filed by: Carrier Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Defendant Familian Corp's Trial Brief; Filed by: Familian Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by J.C. Penney Corporation Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Reply to separate statement; Filed by: Baltimore Aircoil Company (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Objection to Plaintiffs' evidence with [Proposed] rulings; Filed by: The Vons Company, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Not Entered; Filed by: William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Declaration of Jamie O. Norman; Filed by: Baltimore Aircoil Company (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: William Phipps (Plaintiff); As to: M. Slayen & Associates (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by: Baltimore Aircoil Company (Defendant); Total Costs: 17,949.45
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Motion for Preference Pursuant to CCP 36(a), 36(d) and 36(e); Filed by: William Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-18T00:00:00Opposition to MIL No. 46; Filed by: William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Re Defense Motions in Limine) Filed by Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Special Verdict Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Notice (of Association) Filed by Copeland Corporation, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Other - (List of Proposed Former Testimony) Filed by Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Plaintiffs for an Order Co...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Statement of the Case (- Proposed) Filed by Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Jury Instructions - Special; Filed by:
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Joinder to Motion (In Limines) Filed by Baltimore Aircoil Company (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Witness List - Trial; Filed by: Carrier Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Witness List - (Proposed) Joint; Filed by: Trane U.S. Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed by Carrier Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Other - (Court's Ruling on Motion to Tax/Strike) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: April 18, 2022Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time for...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Opposition (to MIL No. 39) Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiffs' Amended Former List of Testimony) Filed by Familian Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Reply (to separate statement) Filed by Baltimore Aircoil Company (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment for Defendant the Vons Inc. Filed by:
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Opposition (to MIL No. 31) Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Witness List (- Trial) Filed by Carrier Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Witness List ((Proposed) Joint) Filed by Trane U.S. Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part V) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Ferguson Enterprises Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference (Re Phipps 18STCV02021))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Jury Question; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Opposition (to MIL No. 47) Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Statement of the Case (- Joint [Proposed]) Filed by Trane U.S. Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Defense MIL Index with Ruling and Comments Filed by Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part IV); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part IV) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Opposition (to MIL No. 46) Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an order to compel plaint...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Opposition (to MIL No. 19) Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Baltimore Aircoil Company (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Rulings on Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine; Filed by: Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Exhibit List (for use at Trial - Proposed) Filed by Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (Re Phipps-18STCV02021))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Exhibit List (- Amended) Filed by Copeland Corporation, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (Re Phipps-18STCV02021))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) (Amended); Filed by: William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Undertaking; Filed by:
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Answer Filed by Keenan Properties, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- "U0"; Filed by: Copeland Corporation, LLC (Appellant)
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Court Order)])
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail ((E-mail /Electronic Transmission))
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial (and Estimate of Length of Trial by Defendant CBS Corporation)
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial (and Estimate of Length of Trial)
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ((Initial Status Conference (Re: Phipps-18STCV02021)))
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-12-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Motion for Preference Pursuant to CCP 36(a), 36(d) and 36(e)
Date: 2018-12-18T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons
Date: 2018-12-24T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference (Re: Phipps-18STCV02021)))
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Trial Setting Order
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's notice of motion for summary Judgment
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Declaration (of P. Casey Mathews)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Separate Statement (of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Other - (Appendix of Documentary Evidence in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail ((E-mail /Electronic Transmission))
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference (Re: Phipps-18STCV02021)))
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement (for all Los Angeles Superior Court Asbestos Cases)
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Notice (of Informal Discovery Conference RE: Defendant Carrier Corporation Standard Interrogatories)
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Notice of Rulings at further Status Conference
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) (Re: Phipps-18STCV02021)))
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Notice (of Further Informal Discovery Conference Re: Defendant Carrier Corporation)
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Declaration (of Harrison S. Smith)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail ((E-mail /Electronic Transmission))
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Declaration (of Sheldon H. Rabinovitz)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Declaration (of T. Eric Sun)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Declaration (of Robert D. Castillo)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time ...))
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Declaration (of Ellen R. Hurley)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail ((E-mail /Electronic Transmission))
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Robert J. Bugatto)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order Granting Defendant Carrier Corporation's Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Notice (of Further Informal Discovery Conference re: Defendant J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) (Re: Phipps-18STCV02021)))
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) (Re Phipps-18STCV02021)))
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Plaintiffs for an Order Co...))
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (Not Entered)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Opposition (of Defendant, J.C. Penney Corporation, to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (re Use of Visual Displays at Trial)
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Statement of the Case (- Proposed)
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Other - (List of Proposed Former Testimony)
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Other - (Defendant Familian Corp's List of Former Testimony)
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Notice (of Association of Counsel)
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Ryan S. Landis in support of Defendant Union Carbide Corporation's Motions In Limine)
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Defendant Copeland Corporation LLC's List of Former Testimony
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MIL No. 19 - To preclude evidence of working conditions at Union Carbide facilities)
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MIL No. 34 - To exclude evidence of Plaintiff William Phipps' medical expenses)
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Other - (Plaintiffs' former List of Testimony)
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Motion in Limine ((MIL 1) re Admissibility of evidence of William Phipps' irrelevant smoking history)
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiffs' Amended Former List of Testimony)
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiffs' Notice to Appear and Produce Documents at Trial)
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiffs' Amended former List of Testimony)
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Witness List (- Proposed Trial)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Stipulation Re: Jury (Civil Trials); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Johnson Controls, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part I); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Exhibit List (- Joint) Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Witness List (- (Proposed) Second Amended Joint) Filed by Trane U.S. Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference (Re: Phipps-18STCV02021))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Opposition (to MIL No. 11) Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part VI A); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Keenan Properties, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Notice (of Taking MSJ/MSA Off Calendar) Filed by Carrier Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part I) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Opposition (to MIL No. 21) Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Association; Filed by: Copeland Corporation, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Opposition (to MIL No. 4) Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part V); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Other - Court's Rulings on Motions in Limine; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part VI A) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Stipulation Re: Jury (Civil Trials) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Opposition (to MIL No. 3) Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion In Limine No. 2 - Joint) Filed by Carrier Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Westburne Supply, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Special Verdict; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Trial Brief - Supplemental; Filed by: Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Exhibit List (- Trial) Filed by Carrier Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part VI B) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Rulings on Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine Filed by Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal With Prejudice; Filed by: William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Appellate Order Extending Time for Reporter Transcript Prep NOA: B302627; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed by Westburne Supply, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail ((E-mail /Electronic Transmission)) Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Opposition (to MIL No. 28) Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Answer Filed by Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Answer Filed by Metalclad Insulation Corp. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Answer Filed by Familian Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ((Initial Status Conference (Re: Phipps-18STCV02021))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Answer Filed by Carrier Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Opposition to MIL No. 1; Filed by: William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Notice (of Association of Counsel) Filed by Trane U.S. Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Carrier Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) (Re: Phipps-18STCV02021))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Exhibit List - Trial; Filed by: Familian Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Copeland Corporation, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Answer Filed by Johnson Controls, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (re Use of Visual Displays at Trial) Filed by Familian Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by William Phipps (Plaintiff); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) (Re: Phipps-18STCV02021))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Baltimore Aircoil Company (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Peter Christopher Beirne (Attorney); Linda Phipps (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Objection to Plaintiffs' Amended Former List of Testimony; Filed by: Familian Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Exhibit List (- Trial)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Witness List (- Trial)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Exhibit List (for use at Trial - Proposed)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Application (of Jon B. Orndorff for Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Order Granting Application of Jon B. Orndorff for Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Witness List (- (Proposed) Second Amended Joint)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Reply (brief in support of its Motion For Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Plainitiffs' page line designation of deposition testimony of John L. Myers dated February 7 and 8, 2005
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Statement of the Case (- Joint [Proposed])
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (of Ellen R. Hurley and Exhibits)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiffs' evidence with [Proposed] rulings)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Reply (memorandum of points and authorities in support of Motion For MSJ/MSA)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Declaration (of Jamie O. Norman)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Reply (to separate statement)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Witness List (- (Proposed) Joint)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Defendant Familian Corp's Trial Brief
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Declaration (of Robert D. Castillo)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Exhibit List (- Joint)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Reply (Memorandum in Support of Defendant, Copeland Corporation LLC's, Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Opposition (to MIL No. 31)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Order (Granting Application of Jon B. Orndorff for Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Opposition (to MIL No. 39)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Opposition (to MIL No. 34)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Opposition (to MIL No. 41)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Opposition (to MIL No. 46)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Opposition (to MIL No. 2)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Opposition (to MIL No. 47)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Opposition (to MIL No. 1)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Opposition (to MIL No. 7)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Opposition (to MIL No. 9)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Opposition (to MIL No. 3)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Opposition (to MIL No. 4)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Opposition (to MIL No. 19)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Opposition (to MIL No. 11)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Opposition (to MIL No. 21)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Opposition (to MIL No. 25)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Opposition (to MIL No. 28)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of page line designations of John Myers testimony for dates May 16 and 17, 2002)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Reply (in support of Motion For Summary Judgment or, alternatively, for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiffs' evidentiary objections)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Objection (to evidence cited in Plaintiffs' opposition to defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion In Limine No. 2 - Joint)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Witness List ((Proposed) Joint)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Reply (brief in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Reply (brief in support of its Motion For Summary Judgment or, in the alternative, Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Motion For Summary Judgment off calendar)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Separate Statement (of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference (Re: Phipps-18STCV02021)))
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Exhibit List (- Joint (with updated Exhibits))
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Exhibit List (- Amended)
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Witness List (- Trial)
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Exhibit List (- Trial)
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (at Final Status Conference 5/6/19)
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Joint Statement of Issues Re Informal Discovery Conference Re: Redacted Pages of Navy Records
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Statement of the Case (- [Proposed] Joint)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference (Re Phipps 18STCV02021)))
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Witness List (- (Proposed) Third Amended Joint)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Notice (of Taking MSJ/MSA Off Calendar)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Notice (of Partial Resolution of Matter)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Christopher Cole in Support of Informal Discovery Conference Re VA Disability Claims)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Defendant Trane U.S. Inc.'s Notice of Partial Resolution of this matter
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Notice (of taking its Motion For Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative...))
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Defendant Union Carbide Corporation's Notice of Association of Counsel
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Notice (of Intent to use visual displays during opening statement pursuant to Local Rule 3.97)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply to Defendant Baltimore Aircoil Company's MSJ/MSA
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Brief (re: 1947 Ohio regulations, in support of Motion For Summary Adjudication - (Supplemental))
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application (Jihan Walker)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (Re: Phipps-18STCV02021); Hearing on Motion for Su...))
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Joint Party Stipulation Regarding Defendant Union Carbide's Motions in Limine #s 18, 20, and 22
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an order to compel plaint...))
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (granting Defendant Baltimore Aircoil Company's Motion For Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Commission to Take Deposition Outside California
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (Re Phipps-18STCV02021)))
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Defense MIL Index with Ruling and Comments
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part I)
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part VI B)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Rulings on Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part VI A)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part V)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part IV)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (Re Phipps-18STCV02021)))
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part II)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Rulings on Page-Line Objections (Part III)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Trial Brief (- Supplemental)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Stipulation Re: Jury (Civil Trials)
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Judgment (in Favor of Baltimore Aircoil Company and Against Plaintiffs William and Linda Phipps)
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Other - (Court's Rulings on Motions in Limine)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Re Defense Motions in Limine)
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Trial Brief (Regarding Bankruptcy Claim Forms)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling ((Amended) Regarding Defense Motions in Limine)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Trial Brief (Regarding Anticipated Testimony of Person Most Knowledgeable, Mark Gibson.)
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Other - (Motion for Nonsuit; Declaration of T. Eric Sun in Support Thereof.)
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Objection (to Motion to Strike Portion of the Declarations)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/16/2019)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Declaration (Of Brian P. Barrow)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Brian P. Barrow In Opposition)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Declaration (Of David R. Carpenter In Support of Copeland Corporation LLC's Motion For New Trial)
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant Copeland Motion for New Trial)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Joinder to Motion (In Limines)
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Other - (Plaintiffs' former List of Testimony)
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/28/2019)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for New Trial; Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs))
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs))
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Other - (Court's Ruling on Motion to Tax/Strike)
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/25/2019, Copy of Judgment)
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed (JCCP4674 "U0")
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 (JCCP4674 "U0")
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid (JCCP4674 "U0" Appellant)
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (With Prejudice)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Appellate Order Extending Time for Reporter Transcript Prep (NOA:10/15/19 B302627)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Notice to Reporter to Prepare Transcript on Appeal (JCCP4674 "U0" NOA 10/15/19 B302627)
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Notice to Reporter to Prepare Transcript on Appeal (JCCP4674 "U0" NOA 10/15/19 B302627)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) ("U0")
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (With Prejudice)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed (B302627)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Melanie L. Ameele in Support of Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time for...))
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Notice (of entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Jury Question
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order Granting Defendant The Vons Companies, INC.'s Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Objection (To Proposed Judgment On Verdict)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Temporary Stay on Enforcement of Judgment Pursuant to CCP 918)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (- By Electronic Transmission)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings for Temporary Stay on Enforcement of Jud...))
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Other - (Proof of Service of Plaintiffs' (Proposed) Judgment with Verdict Form and Exhibit A.)
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Conference (Telephonic)))
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Judgment (on Verdict)
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Other - (Baltimore Aircoil Company's Withdrawal of Memorandum of Costs)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Notice (of Association)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 07/16/2019)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) ((Amended))
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Declaration (In Support of Motion For New Trial)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Motion for New Trial
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Compendium of Trial Transcript Excerpts in Support of Motion For New Trial
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2018-12-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (Not Entered)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (Re Phipps-18STCV02021)))
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.