Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Lim Mary, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case against City Of Los Angeles, Colonnade Wilshire Corporation, represented by Whitaker Ronald Stephen, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Spring Street Courthouse with Jon R. Takasugi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJon R. Takasugi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 23, 2018 |
CategoryPremises Liability (E.G.Slip & Fall) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedApril 14, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseSpring Street Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 23, 2018Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 23, 2018Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: May 22, 2019Answer
Date: May 22, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: June 06, 2019Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: October 29, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: November 13, 2019Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: January 09, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: May 11, 2020Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: May 15, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: August 05, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: August 05, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: September 15, 2020Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: September 29, 2020Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: December 18, 2020Response - RESPONSE TO PETITION TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
Date: January 27, 2021Motion for Reconsideration
Date: January 29, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: January 29, 2021Response - RESPONSE TO PETITION TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
Date: February 01, 2021Motion for Reconsideration
Date: February 01, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) OF 02/03/2021
Date: February 03, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: February 03, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: April 05, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION)
Date: April 05, 2021Motion for Reconsideration
Date: April 08, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION)
Date: August 04, 2021Response to Petition
Date: August 04, 2021Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: September 01, 2021Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: September 07, 2021Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: November 02, 2021Order - Dismissal
Date: December 20, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE WI...)
Date: December 20, 2021Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - APPEAL DISMISSED B315036
Date: January 12, 2022Exhibit List
Date: July 22, 2022Motion re: - MOTION RE: POSTPONEMENT OF TRIAL AND CONFERENCE DATE
Date: July 22, 2022Witness List
Date: July 22, 2022Statement of the Case
Date: July 22, 2022Jury Instructions
Date: July 22, 2022Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE TO DENY ALL 10 OF THE DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS
Date: July 25, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: July 26, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER PROOF OF SERVICE)
Date: August 24, 2022Trial Brief
Date: September 06, 2022Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment
Date: November 18, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER PROOF OF SERVICE)
Date: March 15, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: March 16, 2023Motion to Vacate - MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL OF DEFAULT ENTRY
Date: March 24, 2023Motion for Terminating Sanctions
Date: March 24, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 24, 2023Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/24/2023
Date: April 24, 2023Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: June 01, 2023Motion to Continue - MOTION TO CONTINUE FINAL CONFERENCE
Date: June 01, 2023Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 05, 2023Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment
Date: June 05, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS)
Date: June 07, 2023Jury Instructions
Date: June 14, 2023Exhibit List
Date: June 14, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: June 29, 2023Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal B315036, NA09.01.21; PER 8.100(g); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mary Lim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Mary Lim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Trial Setting Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Mary Lim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Mary Lim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Court
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration; Filed by: Mary Lim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Updated -- Motion for Reconsideration: Filed By: Mary Lim (Plaintiff); Result: Denied; Result Date:
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Response to Petition; Filed by: Mary Lim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant); As to: Mary Lim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed B315036; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration; Filed by: Mary Lim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Mary Lim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Response to Demand for Production of Documents; Filed by: Mary Lim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine to deny all 10 of the Defendant's Motions; Filed by: Mary Lim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00; Default not entered as to Colonnade Wilshire Corporation; On the Complaint filed by Mary Lim on
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Mary Lim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Answer Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Mary Lim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Mary Lim (Appellant)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Mary Lim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Rescheduling hearings Pursuant to Emergency O...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Mary Lim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Mary Lim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (PLAINTIF'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER THE RULING TO GRANT DEFENDANT...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (B315036, NA09.01.21; PER 8.100(g)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Trial Setting Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other proof of service)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B315036) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Failure to Prosecute wi...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Complaint
Date: October 23, 2018Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: October 23, 2018Notice of Ruling Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- Filed by Mary Lim (Appellant)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Response (to Demand for Production of Documents) Filed by Mary Lim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Failure to Prosecute wi...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Motion re: (Postponement of trial and Conference date) Filed by Mary Lim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration Filed by Mary Lim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment Filed by Mary Lim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Order - Dismissal Filed by Court
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed Filed by Mary Lim (Appellant)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Response to Petition Filed by Mary Lim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration; Filed by: Mary Lim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00; Default not entered as to Colonnade Wilshire Corporation; On the Complaint filed by Mary Lim on
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Mary Lim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Witness List Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Response (to Demand for Production of Documents) Filed by Mary Lim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-26T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Trial Setting Conference) of 02/03/2021)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Response (to Demand for Production of Documents)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION BY CITY OF LOS ANGELES TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE))
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Rescheduling hearings Pursuant to Emergency O...))
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration) of 04/05/2021)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")))
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration))
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Response (to Demand for Production of Documents)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (B315036, NA09.01.21; PER 8.100(g))
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration) of 08/04/2021)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration))
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Failure to Prosecute wi...))
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Response to Petition
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (PLAINTIF'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER THE RULING TO GRANT DEFENDANT...))
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Witness List
Date: June 14, 2023Trial Brief
Date: June 14, 2023Statement of the Case
Date: June 14, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: June 15, 2023Statement of the Case
Date: June 26, 2023Jury Instructions
Date: June 26, 2023Trial Brief
Date: June 26, 2023Witness List
Date: June 26, 2023Exhibit List
Date: June 26, 2023Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: June 27, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.