Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mcclendon Monique Kal, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Riley Grant K., against Compean Robert, Shelter First Llc, Urban Street Properties Inc., represented by Susolik Edward, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Michael P. Linfield presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael P. Linfield Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management120 days |
Filing DateOctober 17, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time657 days |
Certificate of Mailing for (Final Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Bond Upon Qualifying; Filed by:
Date: June 30, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Monique Kal McClendon (Plaintiff); As to: Urban Street Properties, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Urban Street Properties, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Monique Kal McClendon (Plaintiff); Justin Amoray Williams-McClendon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Monique Kal McClendon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by:
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Filed by:
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Robert Compean (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Shelter First LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...))
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL...))
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE; MEMOR...))
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Order (ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION)
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO 1) COMPEL DEPOSITIONS OF D...))
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 09/11/2019)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME ...))
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Opposition (Omnibus Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel; Declaration of Gregory J.Carpenter)
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions; Declaration of Gregory J.Carpenter)
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Notice ( OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO FILE AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Reply (BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Reply (PLAINTIFFS' REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date of December 2, 2019)
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Drew Harbur in Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date of De...))
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Subpoena to Third-Party Witness Catherine Ann Mazzucco)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Reply (Sur Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Request for Sanctions)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...))
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Reply (PLAINTIFFS' AND THIRD-PARTY WITNESS CATHERINE MAZZUCCO'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (ON MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITON SUBPOENA DIRECTED TO CATHERINE MAZZUCCO)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash MOTION TO QUASH DEFENDANTS' SUBPOE...))
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No.1)
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 3 to exclude evidence of the parties financial status)
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Current Trial Da...))
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 4 o exclude evidence of specified testimony by Yvonee Flores)
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application to Continue Current Trial Date of January 13, 2020)
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Drew Harbur in support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 2)
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No.8)
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Motion to Bifurcate
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No.5)
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No.9 to exclude evidence of insurance coverage)
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 7 to exclude any reference to Flint, Michigan)
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No.6)
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 4)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 8)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 5)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 16)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 14)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 15)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 13)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 11)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Declaration (OF GRANT RILEY REGARDING MEET AND CONFER EFFORTS ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 20)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 10)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 12)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 19)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 15)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 17)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Notice (DEFENDANTS? REQUESTED WRITTEN JUROR QUESTIONNAIRE AND SUPPLEMENTAL JUROR QUESTIONNAIRE)
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 9)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Opposition ( TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 17 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF LATE PAYMENT OF RENT)
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Opposition (Defendants' Opposition to plaintiff's proposed special jury instructions)
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Notice and Ex Parte Application for Protective Order)
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Reply (PLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE)
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate))
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Opposition (DEFENDANTS? OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS? REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE)
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Protective Order))
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Joinder (to ex parte application)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise with Special Needs Trust
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO FINALIZE COURT APPROVAL OF...))
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Final Status Conference) of 01/07/2020)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO REQUEST THAT COURT CLERK W...))
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise with Specia...))
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Notice (NOMINATION OF TRUSTEE)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/14/2020)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: August 04, 2020Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise with Specia...))
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION)
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.