Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Poe James, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Feghali Allen Victor, Moest Robert C., against Carey Kimberly A., Local Initiative Health Authority For Los Angeles County Dba L.A. Care Health Plan, Medpoint Management Inc., O Jeanette, represented by Campo Joseph C, Friedberg Jerome Hugh, Mcdonough Eric Robert, Murtagh Paul G, Moest Robert C., (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Spring Street Courthouse with Maren Nelson presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management487 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 12, 2018 |
CategoryFraud (No Contract) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions402 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSpring Street Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Civil Case Cover Sheet -
Date: October 12, 2018Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST) (AMENDED)
Date: October 12, 2018Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) -
Date: October 12, 2018Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case -
Date: October 12, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order re: initial status conference)
Date: December 12, 2018Ex Parte Application - Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading
Date: December 18, 2018Order - Order Initial Status Conference Order
Date: December 12, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Extension Of Time To Serv...)
Date: December 20, 2018Proof of Personal Service
Date: December 21, 2018Proof of Service - No Service
Date: December 21, 2018Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: January 15, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service of Notice of Case Reassignment
Date: February 01, 2019Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: February 01, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re Affidavit of Prejudice Regarding Judge Amy Hogue)
Date: February 07, 2019Initial Status Conference Order
Date: February 20, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Initial Status Conference)
Date: February 20, 2019Initial Status Conference Report - INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT /STATEMENT
Date: March 15, 2019Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2019Request for Refund / Order
Date: March 20, 2019Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: March 22, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: March 22, 2019Notice of Related Case
Date: March 27, 2019Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: April 10, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE RELATED CASE;)
Date: April 18, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER
Date: April 23, 2019Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: May 02, 2019Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: May 06, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 06, 2019Status Report - JOINT STATUS REPORT; EXHIBITS
Date: May 17, 2019Notice of Related Case
Date: May 17, 2019Brief - PLAINTIFF'S LETTER BRIEF RE INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE
Date: May 20, 2019Other - - PLAINTIFF'S AMENDMENTS TO DEFENDANTS' JOINT STATUS REPORT
Date: May 20, 2019Response - RESPONSE TO REPLY PAPERS BY DEFENDANT LA CARE
Date: May 21, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING JOINT STATUS REPORT; EXHIBIT
Date: May 21, 2019Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: May 28, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: June 03, 2019Order - ORDER REGARDING CONDUCT OF MEET AND CONFER SESSIONS
Date: June 18, 2019Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER PROTECTING CONFIDENTIALITY
Date: July 05, 2019Order - ORDER REQUIRING DISCLOSURE OF PLAINTIFF'S NAME
Date: July 09, 2019Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: July 09, 2019Order - ORDER TAKING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION AND INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR
Date: August 05, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: July 30, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: October 18, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: October 07, 2019Objection - OBJECTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S IMPROPER SUR-REPLY
Date: November 13, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10))
Date: November 18, 2019Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: November 18, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: November 22, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER MINUTE ORDER)
Date: November 22, 2019Message Board Posting - MESSAGE BOARD POSTING RE: SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: January 02, 2020Status Report - DEFENDANTS' STATUS REPORT
Date: January 22, 2020Motion for Order - Motion for an Order Clarifying Prior Rulings on the Pleadings
Date: January 27, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: February 11, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: February 11, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: March 02, 2020Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: March 02, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING)
Date: March 18, 2020Status Conference Report - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT
Date: July 02, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 23, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: July 08, 2020Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING FROM STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: July 09, 2020Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: August 11, 2020Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: August 11, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 11, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: October 23, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: October 09, 2020Order - ORDER ON DEMURRERS AND MOTION TO STRIKE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: October 23, 2020Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: January 11, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: October 23, 2020Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing
Date: December 18, 2020Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil)
Date: December 29, 2020Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: December 22, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: STAY ON APPEAL)
Date: July 26, 2021Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal - APPELLATE ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL B312322; NA 03/23/21
Date: January 25, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: STAY ON APPEAL)
Date: July 28, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: July 29, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: STAY ON APPEAL)
Date: March 16, 2023Status Conference Report - STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: March 13, 2023Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: May 19, 2023Motion re: - Motion for Clarification of Orders Pertaining to "Meet and Confer" Sessions
Date: January 27, 2020Status Conference Report - Plaintiff's Status Conference Report
Date: January 27, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: January 28, 2020Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: January 28, 2020Memorandum of Costs on Appeal
Date: May 30, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: May 22, 2023Joint Status Conference Report
Date: June 13, 2023Order - ORDER ORDER
Date: June 20, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE RE: TRIAL SETTING)
Date: June 20, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: June 28, 2023Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER
Date: June 28, 2023Ex Parte Application (for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading)
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Proof of Service of (1) Initial Status Conference Order and (2) Minute Order Dated December 12, 2018
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Defendants' Joint Opposition to Plaintiff's Continued Use of a Fictitious Name
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Order (regarding conduct of meet and confer sessions)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Other - (Evidentiary Objections of Defendants to Declaration of James Poe; Order)
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Order (Requiring Disclosure of Plaintiff's Name)
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: re: Plaintiff's Use of a Fictitious Name))
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Order (Taking Plaintiff's Motion and Informal Discovery Conference Off Calendar)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Other - (Response to Order to Show Cause Regarding Status of Fee Waiver - FILED UNDER SEAL)
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) (of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Summary of Plaintiff's Anticipated Oral Argument Regarding Defendants' Demurrers and Motions to Strike
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Defendant Medpoint Management and Kimberly Carey's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Objection (and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Improper Sur-Reply)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 11/22/2019)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order Ruling on Submitted Matter Minute Order))
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Message Board Posting (re: Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Motion for Clarification of Orders Pertaining to "Meet and Confer" Sessions
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Plaintiff's Status Conference Report
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Joinder in LA Care's Motion to Dismiss
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Motion for an Order Clarifying Prior Rulings on the Pleadings
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Defendants' Status Report
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Further Status Conference)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Defendant Medpoint Management, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss; Hearing on Motion For Clarifica...))
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Continuance of Hearing) of 03/18/2020)
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Continuance of Hearing))
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Declaration (by Paul Murtagh RE: Inability to Comply with Meet and Confer Requirements; Exhibits)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Extending Deadline to Respond to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (from Status Conference)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Defendant Medpoint Management, Inc's Notice of Demurrer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer by Defendant MedPoint regarding Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer by Defendant LA Care regarding Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Strike by Defendant LA Care Regarding Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Defendant Local Initiative Healt...))
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Defendant L.A. Care's Motion to Dismiss)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Order (Granting Defendant LA Care's Motion to Dismiss)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Order (on Demurrers and Motion to Strike Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Dismiss Defendant Local In...))
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Reporter's Transcript of Proceedings on October 23, 2020)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by LA Care and the Joinder by Medpoint
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Message Board Posting (re: 1/15/21 Hearing)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Respondent's Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 "U"
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal ("U")
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed ("U")
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance (NOA: 12/22/20 B309862)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Judgment of Dismissal
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Appellate Order Reinstating Appeal (NOA: 12/22/20 B309862)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 ("U" NOA 3/23/21)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 (NOA 12/22/20)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report (Re: Stay on Appeal)
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal (AMENDED)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal (N.O.A. 12/22/2021)
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Permitting Consolidation of 2 Ste...))
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Message Board Posting - MESSAGE BOARD POSTING RE: 1/15/21 HEARING
Date: January 14, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: January 15, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: January 15, 2021Joint Status Conference Report
Date: January 21, 2021Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT L.A. CARE'S MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: January 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: February 02, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT LOCAL INITIATIVE HEALT...)
Date: February 02, 2021Order - ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT LA CARE'S MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: February 02, 2021Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: February 02, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: February 04, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: February 03, 2021Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: February 16, 2021Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: February 24, 2021Judgment - JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL
Date: February 24, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: March 10, 2021Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: March 23, 2021Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: April 02, 2021Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: May 06, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Order (Initial Status Conference Order)
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Extension Of Time To Serv...))
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order re: initial status conference))
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Affidavit of Prejudice Regarding Judge Amy Hogue))
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Proof of Service of Notice of Case Reassignment
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Report (/Statement; Exhibit)
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Report (/Statement)
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Order (Authorizing Electronic Service)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (at Initial Status Conference)
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review for Order to Show Cause Re: Why th...))
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Related Case;))
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order)
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order re Related Case;) of 04/18/2019)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (to Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Demurrer of Defendant Local Initiative Health Authority for Los Angeles County to Plaintiff's Complaint
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 05/06/2019)
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Plaintiff's Combined Opposition to Defendants' Demurrers and Motions to Strike
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Joint Status Report; Exhibits
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (in Support of Proposed Order Protecting Confidentiality)
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Defendants Medpoint Management and Kimberly Carey's Reply in Support of Demurrer and Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Proof of Service of Redacted Declaration
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Plaintiff's Amendments to Defendants' Joint Status Report
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Hearing on Motion to Strike Portio...))
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Notice (of Errata regarding Joint Status Report; Exhibit)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Plaintiff's Letter Brief RE Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Response (to reply papers by Defendant LA Care)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike Portions of Complaint of Medpoint...))
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Motion for Order (Protecting Confidentiality)
Date: 2019-07-05T00:00:00Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.