Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
E.A., filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Kornswiet Robert Lee, against Los Angeles Christian School And World Impact Inc., represented by Olson Sonali Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Spring Street Courthouse with Jon R. Takasugi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJon R. Takasugi Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 10, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions114 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseSpring Street Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time510 days |
Complaint -
Date: October 10, 2018Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case -
Date: October 10, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet -
Date: October 10, 2018Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: December 21, 2018Notice - Notice of Non-Opposition to Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint
Date: January 24, 2019Reply - Reply Reply in Support of Defendants' Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint
Date: January 28, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))
Date: February 01, 2019Answer
Date: February 06, 2019Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: May 15, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: May 15, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: August 22, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: March 03, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: E.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Los Angeles Christian School and World Impact, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Answer Filed by Los Angeles Christian School and World Impact, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by E.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by E.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Complaint Filed by E.A. (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: E.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: March 03, 2020Request for Dismissal Filed by E.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: March 03, 2020Reply (Reply in Support of Defendants' Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Separate Statement (in Support of Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to Form Interrogatories)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (Form Interrogatories)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (Special Interrogatories)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Opposition to Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: March 03, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.