Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gomez Luis, Key Laurenz, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Yazdanpanah Hamed, against Chapman Patrick, Geico General Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Laura A. Seigle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLaura A. Seigle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 09, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Complaint; Filed by: Luis Gomez (Plaintiff); Laurenz Key (Plaintiff); As to: Patrick Chapman (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 03, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Luis Gomez (Plaintiff); Laurenz Key (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet -
Date: October 09, 2018Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case -
Date: October 09, 2018Complaint -
Date: October 09, 2018Summons - on Complaint
Date: October 09, 2018Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 30, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/30/2020
Date: April 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: October 21, 2020Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: December 11, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)
Date: January 29, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)
Date: May 03, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: May 05, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)
Date: August 03, 2021Complaint
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal))
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/30/2020)
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal))
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/17/2020)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: May 05, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.