Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Small Business Financial Solutions Llc, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Brown Katrina M., Figueroa Ernie Garcia, against Veil Brandi, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Upinder S. Kalra presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 24, 2018 |
CategorySister State Judgment (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Application for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment
Date: July 24, 2018Judgment
Date: July 24, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 24, 2018Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 27, 2018Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)
Date: July 17, 2019Writ - Return - Writ - Return
Date: April 08, 2020Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney
Date: August 25, 2020Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (San Diego)
Date: November 02, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re Reassignment)
Date: January 21, 2021Writ - Return - Writ - Return
Date: May 10, 2021Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment - Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: May 14, 2021Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: May 18, 2021Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: May 26, 2021Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (San Diego)
Date: June 09, 2021Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 31, 2021Writ - Return - Writ - Return
Date: December 20, 2021Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SMALL BUSINESS FINANCIAL SOLUTIONS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Reassignment) of 01/21/2021; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: SMALL BUSINESS FINANCIAL SOLUTIONS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.