Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Kurt Ildar, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Baden Tricia, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Matthew St presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMatthew St Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2018 |
CategorySmall Claims (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court
Date: September 19, 2018Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
Date: October 24, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: November 08, 2018Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
Date: November 08, 2018Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]
Date: August 14, 2019Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection
Date: August 14, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)
Date: December 27, 2019Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Ildar Kurt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.