Case Last Refreshed: 12 hours ago
Green Richard, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case against Ailnh Llc, Herrick Norton, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Elaine W. Mandel presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management180 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 11, 2018 |
CategoryOther Contract Dispute (Not Breach/Insurance/Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeDeemed Complete (No Remand From Federal Court) |
Case Cycle Time180 days |
Summons (on Complaint)
Date: October 11, 2018Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Richard Green (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case -
Date: October 11, 2018Complaint - Rescission
Date: October 11, 2018Summons - on Complaint
Date: October 11, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet -
Date: October 11, 2018Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: November 16, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 26, 2018Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: January 02, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: April 09, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: April 09, 2019Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: 2019-01-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Complaint (Rescission)
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Notice (Notice of filing of notice of removal)
Date: 2019-01-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.