Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Barnett, Patricia, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Staffel, Timothy J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStaffel, Timothy J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 27, 2018 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Inventory & Appraisal, Filed Supplemental |
|
August 11, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Petition for Preliminary Distribution The following must be submitted: Supplement. Any request for allowance on Statutory Compensation must be substantiated by showing distribut...
Judge: Judge Timothy Staffel |
|
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Petition for Preliminary Distribution Judge: Staffel, Timothy J |
|
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order, Filed Order for Preliminary Distribution |
|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Waiver, Filed of Notice of William Surch III |
|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Waiver, Filed of Notice of Casey Surch |
|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Waiver, Filed of Notice of Anastasia Surch |
|
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order, Filed Setting Hearing on Petition for Preliminary Distribution |
|
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Petition, Filed for Order for Preliminary Distribution |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.