Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Libbon, Andy, Munger, Michael, Munger, Jason, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeebe, Jed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management462 days |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2018 |
CategoryProbate |
Time To Trial402 days |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Evidentiary Hearing
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Trial Brief, Filed | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Document, Filed | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.