Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of San Luis Obispo County. This case was filed in San Luis Obispo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSan Luis Obispo County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
I. BACKGROUND Wayne and Thelma Hoyt (the “Settlors”)1 created the Hoyt Family Revocable Trust dated September 6, 2000, as amended on December 3, 2001, and restated on March 9, 2017 (the “Trust”). Unde...
Judge: Tana L. Coates |
|
September 25, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
Wayne and Thelma Hoyt (the “Settlors”)1 created the Hoyt Family Revocable Trust dated September 6, 2000, as amended on December 3, 2001, and restated on March 9, 2017 (the “Trust”). Under the terms of...
Judge: Tana L. Coates |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.