Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Velocity Investments Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Farzin Ali, against Barba Jose, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk with Ann H. Park presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 15, 2018 |
CategoryCollections Case - Purchased Debt (Charged Off Consumer Debt Purchased On Or After January 1,2014) (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseNorwalk |
Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Velocity Investments, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Jose Barba (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Default entered as to Jose Barba; On the Complaint filed by Velocity Investments, LLC on
Date: January 18, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Velocity Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Declaration Assignment; Filed by: Velocity Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: January 18, 2019Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Velocity Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Declaration Ledger; Filed by: Velocity Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Declaration re Civil Code 1788.60; Filed by: Velocity Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Summons - on Complaint
Date: June 15, 2018Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)
Date: June 15, 2018Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: June 15, 2018Complaint
Date: June 15, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 15, 2018Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: September 19, 2018Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: September 19, 2018Declaration (name extension) - Declaration re Civil Code 1788.60
Date: January 18, 2019Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Assignment
Date: January 18, 2019Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Ledger
Date: January 18, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: January 18, 2019Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: January 18, 2019Default Judgment - Default Judgment
Date: May 17, 2019Declaration Ledger; Filed by: Velocity Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Declaration re Civil Code 1788.60; Filed by: Velocity Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Velocity Investments, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Jose Barba (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Default entered as to Jose Barba; On the Complaint filed by Velocity Investments, LLC on 06/15/2018
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Velocity Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Velocity Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Declaration Assignment; Filed by: Velocity Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.