Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Oportun Inc., filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Jaramillo Gomez Antonio, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Douglas W. Stern presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 24, 2018 |
CategorySmall Claims (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJuly 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: August 09, 2018Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents
Date: July 24, 2018Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court
Date: July 24, 2018Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
Date: July 24, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: August 30, 2018Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/30/2018
Date: August 30, 2018Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)
Date: August 30, 2018Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: August 30, 2018Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/30/2018; Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 30, 2018Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: August 30, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.