Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Elias David, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case against Aguero Claudia, Anderson Gary Jemal, Berry Teresa, Ca Bar Association, Carmona Maren Grubb, (total of 30) See All represented by Adida David, Deihl Penelope M., Masero Nicholas J., Griffin John Thomas, Holton Vanessa Lynne, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse with Mark C. Kim presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management136 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 12, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions128 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseGovernor George Deukmejian Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time338 days |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case -
Date: October 12, 2018Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service -
Date: October 12, 2018Complaint
Date: October 12, 2018Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: October 12, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 12, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference -
Date: October 12, 2018Notice - Notice Of demurrer and Demurrer to Plaintiff David A. Elias' 1st Amended Complaint
Date: November 26, 2018Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: December 07, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Ex-Parte Proceedings)
Date: December 07, 2018Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: December 11, 2018Proof of Personal Service
Date: December 11, 2018Notice of Rejection - Pleadings
Date: December 12, 2018Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: December 12, 2018Ex Parte Application - Ex Parte Application Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Date: December 14, 2018Opposition - OPPOSITION TO CA BAR DEMURRER TO HIS COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Ex-Parte Proceedings for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: December 14, 2018Request - REQUEST FOR 30 DAYS ADDITIONAL TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANTS
Date: December 31, 2018Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: January 02, 2019Response - RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Date: January 07, 2019Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: February 04, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: February 08, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 13, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: February 22, 2019Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: February 25, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA AS TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 26, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: February 28, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: June 04, 2019Other - - OTHER - TENTATIVE RULING
Date: May 30, 2019Other - - OTHER - TENTATIVE RULING (DEMURRER)
Date: June 13, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO SAVANNA PETRA TUTAJ DEMURRER
Date: June 24, 2019Order - Dismissal
Date: June 25, 2019Other - - OTHER - TENTATIVE RULING (DEMURRER)
Date: June 25, 2019Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)
Date: July 02, 2019Other - - OTHER - TENTATIVE RULING (DEMURRER)
Date: July 02, 2019Other - - OTHER - PLAINTIFF'S OSC RESPONSE, PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ANDREA LUA
Date: August 05, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO TERESA BERRY'S DEMURRER
Date: August 07, 2019Other - - OTHER - TENTATIVE RULING (MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS)
Date: August 08, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION
Date: September 17, 2019Status Report - OBJECTION TO TERESA BERRY DISMISSAL 9-17-19
Date: September 17, 2019Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING OF THE PROOF OF SERVICE ON SHERRY DIAMOND
Date: September 17, 2019Other - - TENTATIVE RULING AND FINAL ORDER
Date: September 19, 2019Status Conference Report - PLAINTIFF'S PROGRESS STATUS REPORT COMPLYING WITH COURTS ORDER
Date: September 20, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10))
Date: September 19, 2019Objection - OBJECTION TO DANA JONES MOTION TO STRIKE AND DEMURRER
Date: September 20, 2019Objection - OBJECTION TO PETER LEE MOTION TO STRIKE DEMURRER
Date: September 20, 2019Objection - OBJECTION TO ROBERT K. KAMAMATSU'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND DEMURRER
Date: September 20, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: September 24, 2019Order - ORDER ENTRY OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT PETER LEE
Date: September 25, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10))
Date: September 24, 2019Judgment - JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT RON SAXON
Date: September 25, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10))
Date: September 26, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: October 01, 2019Judgment - JUDGMENT [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT DANA JONES
Date: October 03, 2019Judgment - JUDGMENT [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT ROBERT KASAMATSU
Date: October 03, 2019Order - ORDER PROPOSED ENTRY OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT TERESA BERRY
Date: October 04, 2019Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: October 10, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: October 10, 2019Notice - PLAINTIFFS EXHIBITS
Date: October 23, 2019Objection - OBJECTION TO RULING, DISMISSING CAROLYN OLSON
Date: October 23, 2019Objection - OBJECTION TO COURTS RULING DISMISSING MAREN GRUBB CARMONA
Date: October 23, 2019Objection - OBJECTION TO TERESA BERRY PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS W/ EXHIBITS
Date: October 23, 2019Objection - OBJECTION TO SONIA GOMEZ DISMISSAL
Date: October 23, 2019Complaint
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) (amendment to complaint doe 1- Gary Jemal Anderson c)
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (to Plaintiff David A. Elias' 1st Amended Complaint)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (And Demurrer To Plaintiffs David A. Elias' 1st Amended Complaint)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (In Support Of His Ex Parte Writ For Injunction And Enjoining)
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ex-Parte Proceedings))
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ex-Parte Proceedings for Preliminary Injunction))
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Motion for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Declaration (Of Notice, In Support Of His Ex Parte Writ For Injunction And Enjoining)
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-01-02T00:00:00Opposition (To Ca Bar Demurrer To His Complaint)
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Request (For 30 Days Additional Time To Serve Defendants)
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Response (To Order To Show Cause Hearing)
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Other - - OTHER - HEARING ON DEMURRER (TENTATIVE RULING)
Date: March 07, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: March 06, 2019Judgment - JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL ON DECISION OF COURT
Date: March 08, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: March 12, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: March 08, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: March 21, 2019Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: April 18, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: April 23, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA (2ND) AS TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: April 23, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: April 24, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: April 26, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: May 06, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION
Date: May 16, 2019Objection - OBJECTION TO SAVANNA PETRA TUTAJ DEMURRER/STRIKE MOTION
Date: May 21, 2019Objection - OBJECTION TO OSC WITH PROOF OF SERVICE EXHIBITS
Date: May 21, 2019Objection - OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO QUASH
Date: May 21, 2019Objection - OBJECTION TO RON SAXMANS DEMURRER MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: May 21, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO CAROLYN OLSON'S DEMURRER/MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: May 21, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION GARY ANDERSON DEMURRER/MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: May 21, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PETER LEE'S DEMURRER MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: May 21, 2019Objection - OBJECTION TO SONIA GOMEZ, DEMURRER
Date: May 21, 2019Objection - OBJECTION TO CITY OF LONG BEACH DEMURRER MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: May 21, 2019Other - - OTHER - TENTATIVE RULINGS
Date: May 23, 2019Order - Dismissal
Date: May 23, 2019Judgment - JUDGMENT FOLLOWING ORDER GRANTING DEMURRER WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND
Date: May 28, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: May 28, 2019Order - ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: May 28, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: May 28, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO CAROLYN OLSON'S DEMURRER/STRIKE
Date: May 29, 2019Request - REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO COMPLY FOR HEALTH REASONS
Date: May 29, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO TERESA BERRY DEMURRER
Date: August 08, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PETER LEE'S DEMURRER
Date: August 08, 2019Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO PETER LEES DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 10, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 10, 2019Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 12, 2019Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 12, 2019Objection - OBJECTION OBJECTION- TO PETER LEE MOTIONS TO STRIKE - DEMURRER
Date: September 17, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10))
Date: September 17, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (To Plaintiff's 1st Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Opposition (To Maren Grubb Carmona's Motion To Squash And Service Of 1st Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Request (For Extension On All Pending Motions And Matters, For Medical Reasons, With Exhibits)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (To Plaintiff's 1st Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Notice (Of Errata As To Demurrer To Plaintiff's 1st Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Other - (Hearing On Demurrer (Tentative Ruling))
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons (Complaint And 1st Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Notice (Re: March 15, 2019 Case Management Conference And OSC Re; Proof Of Service)
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Judgment (Of Dismissal On Decision Of Court)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment (Or Order)
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Notice (Of Errata (2nd) As To Demurrer To Plaintiff's 1st Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Notice (Of Non-Opposition)
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Opposition (To Carolyn Olson's Demurrer/Motion To Strike)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Opposition (To Maren Grubb Carmona's Demurrer And Motion To Squash)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Objection (To City Of Long Beach Demurrer Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Objection (To OSC With Proof Of Service Exhibits)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Objection (To Defendant's Motion To Quash)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Objection (Gary Anderson Demurrer/Motion To Strike)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Objection (To Ron Saxmans Demurrer Motion To Strike)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Objection (To Sonia Gomez, Demurrer)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Judgment (Following Order Granting Demurrer Without Leave To Amend)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Other - (Tentative Rulings)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Objection (To Savanna Petra Tutaj Demurrer/Strike Motion)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Objection (To Peter Lee's Demurrer Motion To Strike)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Notice (Of Entry Of Judgment)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Demurrer For Defendant City Of Long Beach, Paxton,Luna, Et Al.)
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Opposition (To Carolyn Olson's Demurrer/Strike)
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Request (For Additional Time To Comply For Health Reasons)
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Order ((Proposed))
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Reply (To Plaintiff's Opposition To Demurrer To Plaintiff's 1st Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Other - (Tentative ruling)
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Other - (Tentative Ruling (Demurrer))
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Reply (To Plaintiff's Opposition To Demurrer To Plaintiff's 1st Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Reply (To Plaintiff's Opposition To Demurrer To Plaintiff's 1st Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition To Demurrer To Palintiff'[s 1st Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Reply (To Plaintiff's Opposition To Demurrer To Plaintiff's 1st Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Opposition (To Savanna Petra Tutaj Demurrer)
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Other - (Points And Authorities In Opposition To Maren Grub Carmona Demurrer)
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Opposition (to Savanna Petra Tutaj Demurrer)
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (in Opposition To Marne Grub Carmona Demurrer)
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Reply (To Plaintiff's Opposition To Demurrer To Plaintiff's 1st Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Other - (Tentative Ruling (Demurrer))
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((2nd) Complaint For Damages And Injunction Demand For Jury Trial)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Other - (Tentative Ruling (Demurrer))
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Re: Defendant Sonia Gomez' Demurrer To Plaintff's 1st Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Judgment (Re: Defendant Sonia Gomez' Demurrer To Plaintiff's 1st Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/16/2019)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Other - (Plaintiff's OSC Response, Proof Of Service For Andrea Lua)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Opposition (To Teresa Berry Demurrer)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Opposition (To Peter Lee's Demurrer)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons) of 08/08/2019)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Other - (Tentative Ruling (Motion To Quash Service Of Summons))
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Opposition (To Teresa Berry's Demurrer)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Other - (Entry Of Order Of Dismissal Of Defendant Carolyn Olson)
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00objection to Teresa Berry dismissal 9-17-19
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Notice (re: Teresa Berry's Motion To Quash Service Of Summons, Complaint And 1st Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Notice (Of Non-Opposition)
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Plaintiff's Progress Status Report Complying with Courts Order
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Objection (to Dana Jones Motion to Strike and Demurrer)
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Objection (to Robert K. Kamamatsu's Motion to Strike and Demurrer)
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Objection (to Peter Lee Motion to Strike Demurrer)
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Order (Entry of Order of Dismissal of Defendant Peter Lee)
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Objection (Objection- to Peter Lee Motions to strike - Demurrer)
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Notice ( Of Non Opposition To Motion To Strike Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Reply ( To Plaintiffs Opposition To Peter Lees Demurrer To Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Tentative Ruling and Final Order
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Strike Portions of First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of the proof of service on Sherry Diamond)
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Judgment (of Dismissal of Defendant Ron Saxon)
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Judgment ([Proposed] Judgment of Dismissal of Defendant Dana Jones)
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Order (PROPOSED ENTRY OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT TERESA BERRY)
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Judgment ([Proposed] Judgment of Dismissal of Defendant Robert Kasamatsu)
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Objection (to Teresa Berry Proposed Order to Dismiss w/ Exhibits)
Date: October 23, 2019Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Plaintiffs Exhibits
Date: October 23, 2019Objection (to Courts Ruling Dismissing Maren Grubb Carmona)
Date: October 23, 2019Notice (of Entry of Judgment)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Objection (to Dismissal of Robert K. Kasamatsu)
Date: October 23, 2019Objection (to Ruling, Dismissing Carolyn Olson)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Supplemental Objection Exhibits , in Opposition to Peter Lee Motion
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Objection (to Sonia Gomez Dismissal)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.