Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Rebeca Carrillo Ochoa, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Carlos Peregrina Toyos, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2018 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2020 | Docket Event | FL-NTC OF GROUP STATUS CONFERENCE | |
March 24, 2020 | Docket Event | FL-NTC OF GROUP STATUS CONFERENCE | |
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event | FL-NTC OF GROUP STATUS CONFERENCE | |
August 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice Regarding Payment of Support - DCSS In | |
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Findings & Order After Hearing c/c; c/v; s/s |
|
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Order: Income Withholding for Support | |
May 20, 2019 | Hearing | Request for Order: Mod Custody/Visitation/Support | |
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Personal RFO |
|
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Amended | |
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.