Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Puentes, Robert, Jr., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Galvez, Erick Edgar, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 29, 2018 |
CategoryDissolution Without Child |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions193 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time193 days |
PROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 05/15/2019
Date: May 15, 2019PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 02/21/2019
Date: February 21, 2019DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 06/10/2019
Date: June 10, 2019PROPERTY DECLARATION - COMMUNITY 01/04/2019
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 02/21/2019 PRELIM
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 05/15/2019 PRELIM & FINAL
Date: May 15, 2019PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 12/14/2018
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00STIPULATION & WAIVERS (NO FEE) 06/10/2019
Date: June 10, 2019RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 01/04/2019 Amount:$435.00
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00SUMMONS 11/29/2018
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 06/10/2019
Date: June 10, 2019NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 06/10/2019
Date: June 10, 2019PROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 02/21/2019
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00PETITION - DISSOLUTION 11/29/2018 Amount:$435.00
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00PROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 01/04/2019
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 11/29/2018
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00PROPERTY DECLARATION - COMMUNITY 05/15/2019
Date: May 15, 2019PROPERTY DECLARATION - COMMUNITY 02/21/2019
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 05/15/2019
Date: May 15, 2019NOTICE - RELATED CASE - UPDATE PARTY 01/04/2019
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00NOTICE - RELATED CASE - UPDATE PARTY 11/29/2018
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 02/21/2019
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.