Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
O'Connor, Aladdin, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by R & S Law Group, Llp, against O'Connor, Nicole Ann, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts Superior with LARSH, ERICK L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 01, 2018 |
CategoryDissolution With Child |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time52 days |
NOTICE - RELATED CASE 05/02/2018
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00PETITION - DISSOLUTION 05/01/2018
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00NOTICE - RELATED CASE 05/01/2018
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00RFO - CUSTODY / VISITATION 05/02/2018 Amount:$60.00
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 05/01/2018
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER - REASSIGNMENT - DISQUALIFICATION 05/02/2018
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00SUMMONS 05/01/2018
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00DECLARATION - MOTION - DISQUALIFY - GRANTED 05/02/2018
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER 06/11/2018
Date: June 11, 2018INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 05/30/2018
Date: May 30, 2018MINUTE ORDER 06/19/2018
Date: June 19, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE 06/05/2018 DV200
Date: June 05, 2018DV REQUEST - RESTRAINING ORDER 05/30/2018
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00NOTICE - RELATED CASE 05/30/2018
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00DV NOTICE - COURT HEARING DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 05/30/2018
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00DV TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 05/30/2018
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00REQUEST - DISMISSAL - GRANTED - FULL CASE 06/22/2018
Date: June 22, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.