Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Alan L. Martini filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against Colony Specialty Insurance Company, Hdi Global Specialty Se, International Insurance Company Of Hannover Se, Premier Claims Management, Llc, represented by David Christophe Hungerford, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Socrates P. Manoukian presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 04, 2018 |
CategoryInsurance Coverage Unlimited (18) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions669 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
This complaint is a cross-complaint filed by Colony Insurance Company against Paul Elias, individually and doing business as APEC Construction. The complaint alleges that Elias failed to disclose civil complaints filed against him and his company, AP...
Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: August 06, 2020Conference: Case Management
Date: January 15, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: August 11, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 26, 2019Answer: Cross Complaint
Date: March 19, 2020Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: July 06, 2020Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: April 08, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: December 13, 2018Answer: Amended Complaint
Date: March 15, 2019Answer: Amended Complaint
Date: April 08, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 29, 2019Minute Order
Date: January 17, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: May 08, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: February 27, 2020Minute Order
Date: May 15, 2019Cross-Complaint
Date: November 26, 2019Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee
Date: March 06, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: January 14, 2019Request: Dismissal
Date: July 02, 2019Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: October 04, 2018Minute Order
Date: August 13, 2020Response/Reply
Date: May 28, 2020Order: Submitted Matter
Date: June 18, 2020Opposition/Objections
Date: August 05, 2020Separate Statement
Date: August 05, 2020Conference: Further Case Management
Date: October 13, 2020Conference: Further Case Management
Date: May 14, 2019Conference: Further Case Management
Date: September 10, 2019Demurrer
Date: April 08, 2019Stipulation and Order
Date: November 21, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: May 08, 2020Opposition/Objections
Date: July 30, 2020Motion: Summary Judgment
Date: March 19, 2020Stipulation and Order
Date: May 27, 2020Opposition/Objections
Date: May 19, 2020Stipulation and Order
Date: June 16, 2020Response/Reply
Date: August 07, 2020Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication
Date: June 02, 2020Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS
Date: July 08, 2019Notice: Entry of Order
Date: August 05, 2020Separate Statement
Date: May 19, 2020Response/Reply
Date: August 12, 2020Request: Judicial Notice
Date: March 19, 2020Conference: Further Case Management
Date: November 12, 2019Minute Order
Date: September 12, 2019Motion: Leave
Date: August 11, 2020Response/Reply
Date: May 19, 2020Separate Statement
Date: May 08, 2020Opposition/Objections
Date: May 19, 2020Opposition/Objections
Date: May 28, 2020Hearing: Motion Summary Judgment
Date: June 02, 2020Response/Reply
Date: August 07, 2020Response/Reply
Date: August 11, 2020Stipulation and Order
Date: August 05, 2020Demurrer
Date: December 13, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: March 03, 2020Notice: Entry of Order
Date: June 25, 2020Motion: Summary Judgment
Date: March 19, 2020Motion: Compel
Date: July 06, 2020Notice: Reassignment of Case
Date: August 10, 2020Motion: Summary Judgment
Date: May 08, 2020Order: Proposed
Date: June 16, 2020Declaration: In Support
Date: April 08, 2019Stipulation and Order
Date: May 28, 2020Separate Statement
Date: July 06, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 18, 2020Response/Reply
Date: May 20, 2020Minute Order
Date: June 02, 2020Statement of Decision
Date: July 30, 2020Judgment
Date: August 03, 2020Separate Statement
Date: May 28, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 06, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: December 28, 2018Separate Statement
Date: March 19, 2020Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication
Date: August 13, 2020Opposition/Objections
Date: May 19, 2020Minute Order
Date: November 25, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 03, 2019Request: Judicial Notice
Date: May 08, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: October 29, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 26, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2020 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Department 20 |
|
September 29, 2020 | Hearing |
Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication
Judge: Department 20 |
|
August 18, 2020 | Hearing | Motion: Compel | |
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 13, 2020 | Hearing | Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication | |
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Response/Reply DEFENDANT HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY SE???S, FORMERLY KNOWN AS INTERNATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF HANNOVER SE???S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF???S MOTION TO FILE SUR-REPLY |
|
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore re: reporter Raquel G. Sharp for 8-13-20 hearing - GRANTED by Judge Lie |
|
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Memorandum: Points and Authorities | |
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion: Leave TBD by court |
|
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Response/Reply 08.18.20 HRG Reply |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.