Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Anthony Dipiero, against Gilbert R Valencia, represented by Stanley R. Apps, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Maureen A. Folan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaureen A. Folan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2018 |
CategoryCollections Rule 3.740 Limited (09) - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K
Date: August 31, 2018Answer (Limited): Up to $10K
Date: November 05, 2018Memorandum: At Issue
Date: March 19, 2019Answer (Limited): Up to $10K
Date: March 04, 2020Request: Dismissal
Date: March 04, 2020Order
Date: March 11, 2020Request: Dismissal
Date: November 16, 2020Notice: Settlement
Date: July 18, 2019Notice: Settlement
Date: March 04, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal of Entire Action |
|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order on Settlement agreement and Stipulation for Judgment: See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Folan, Dept. 6. EFS 3/11/20rb
Judge: Maureen A. Folan |
|
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer (Limited): Up to $10K SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT |
|
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Request for Dismissal per 664.6 |
|
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice: Settlement Time standard set for 7/8/2021 |
|
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice: Settlement Notice of Settlement |
|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memorandum: At Issue Request to Set??Case for Trial/At Issue Memorandum |
|
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer (Limited): Up to $10K to Complaint; Atty Apps |
|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K Complaint |
|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons: Issued/Filed Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.