Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Mahnaz Khazen, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Michael E. Stone, against East West Bank, represented by Kevin E. Fusch, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Sunil R. Kulkarni presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 25, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions256 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee
Date: February 22, 2019Answer: Amended Complaint
Date: March 28, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: February 07, 2019Response/Reply
Date: December 05, 2018Minute Order
Date: December 13, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: August 20, 2018Hearing: Demurrer
Date: December 13, 2018Conference: Case Management
Date: September 04, 2018Motion: Strike
Date: December 13, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: November 30, 2018Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: August 20, 2018Minute Order
Date: February 06, 2019Minute Order
Date: September 04, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: August 20, 2018Order: Submitted Matter
Date: February 05, 2019Minute Order
Date: June 18, 2019Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: May 25, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: November 30, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: February 07, 2019Conference: Further Case Management
Date: February 05, 2019Motion: Strike
Date: August 20, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: December 06, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 27, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: January 22, 2019Notice: Entry of Order
Date: February 11, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 31, 2019Request: Dismissal
Date: January 10, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 30, 2019Conference: Further Case Management
Date: October 29, 2019Motion: Compel
Date: February 07, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: August 20, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: June 18, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: January 17, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: October 15, 2019Minute Order
Date: October 29, 2019Response/Reply
Date: December 05, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: October 10, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal entire with prejudice by atty Stone |
|
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 13, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
Calendar Lines 3 & 4 I. Background This action brought by plaintiff Mahnaz Khazen (“Plaintiff”) against defendant East West Bank (“Defendant”) concerns a loan transaction. According to the complaint, ...
Judge: Mary E. Arand |
|
October 29, 2019 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Department 8 |
|
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 18, 2019 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Department 9 |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement and POS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.