Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Catherine Calderon, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Brian Kelly Cline, against General Motors Llc, General Motors, Llc, represented by Mary Lynn Arens, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Sunil R. Kulkarni presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 18, 2018 |
CategoryOther Contract Unlimited (37) |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time600 days |
Motion: Compel
Date: March 12, 2019Conference: Case Management
Date: August 28, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: March 11, 2019Order
Date: March 22, 2019Ex Parte Application
Date: March 11, 2019Request
Date: March 25, 2019Notice: Settlement
Date: April 05, 2019Order: Submitted Matter
Date: March 27, 2019Motion: Compel
Date: March 26, 2019Response/Reply
Date: March 20, 2019Minute Order
Date: March 26, 2019Response/Reply
Date: March 20, 2019Response/Reply
Date: March 20, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: March 11, 2019Motion: Compel
Date: December 14, 2018Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: March 08, 2019Hearing: Demurrer
Date: November 08, 2018Response/Reply
Date: March 20, 2019Minute Order
Date: November 08, 2018Minute Order
Date: August 28, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: March 08, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: March 08, 2019Minute Order
Date: March 12, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: March 08, 2019Order: Ex Parte
Date: March 11, 2019Minute Order
Date: January 29, 2019Separate Statement
Date: December 14, 2018Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee
Date: October 25, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: January 17, 2019Motion: Compel
Date: December 14, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 23, 2018Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: May 18, 2018Request: Dismissal
Date: January 08, 2020Separate Statement
Date: March 08, 2019Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Date: August 15, 2019Demurrer
Date: August 27, 2018Demurrer
Date: July 23, 2018Minute Order
Date: August 15, 2019Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear
Date: October 31, 2019Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Date: October 31, 2019Separate Statement
Date: March 08, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: August 27, 2018Declaration: In Opposition
Date: March 08, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 17, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: January 29, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: January 09, 2019Separate Statement
Date: March 08, 2019Minute Order
Date: October 31, 2019Separate Statement
Date: March 08, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal entire with prejudice by atty Moses |
|
October 31, 2019 | Hearing |
Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear
Judge: Department 8 |
|
October 31, 2019 | Hearing |
Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Judge: Department 8 |
|
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 15, 2019 | Hearing |
Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Judge: Department 8 |
|
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice: Settlement HRG 05/07/19 Conditional, Dismissal by 8-13-19 |
|
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order: Submitted Matter Order Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Compel: Signed by Judge Kulkarni, D08; See Order for Details; |
|
March 26, 2019 | Hearing | Motion: Compel | |
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.