Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bruce C. Williams, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Bayview Loan Servicing, Llc, Diversified Investment Services, Inc, Fidelity National Title Company, Fidelity National Title Insurance Company, Fidileity National Title And Ins., (total of 7) See All represented by Bryan P. Redington, Josette Darlene Johnson, Matthew Scot Vesterdahl, Stuart B. Wolfe, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Mary E. Arand presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary E. Arand Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 22, 2018 |
CategoryOther Real Property Unlimited (26) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions160 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time518 days |
Minute Order
Date: June 20, 2019Response/Reply
Date: June 20, 2019Response/Reply
Date: June 10, 2019Minute Order
Date: June 13, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: March 20, 2019Motion: Change of Venue
Date: March 20, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: March 20, 2019Order: Proposed
Date: March 20, 2019Hearing: Demurrer
Date: October 02, 2018Hearing: Demurrer
Date: June 13, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: September 18, 2018Conference: Case Management
Date: September 04, 2018Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
Date: December 27, 2018Motion: Quash
Date: March 20, 2019Demurrer
Date: February 28, 2019Response/Reply
Date: September 25, 2018Response/Reply
Date: June 19, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: June 10, 2019Response/Reply
Date: June 10, 2019Response/Reply
Date: September 28, 2018Order: Ex Parte
Date: December 27, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: December 27, 2018Minute Order
Date: October 02, 2018Minute Order
Date: February 07, 2019Application and Order: Ex Parte
Date: December 27, 2018Order: Ex Parte
Date: May 23, 2018Application: Ex Parte (Fee Applies)
Date: May 22, 2018Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: May 22, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: February 28, 2019Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee
Date: January 25, 2019Minute Order
Date: September 04, 2018Hearing: Demurrer
Date: September 03, 2019Request: Judicial Notice
Date: February 28, 2019Response/Reply
Date: June 21, 2019Hearing: Order to Show Cause
Date: June 20, 2019Order: Proposed
Date: September 03, 2019Request: Judicial Notice
Date: July 01, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: March 20, 2019Motion: Change of Venue
Date: June 27, 2019Request: Judicial Notice
Date: March 20, 2019OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve
Date: February 07, 2019Minute Order
Date: June 28, 2019Response/Reply
Date: October 15, 2019Judgment
Date: August 26, 2019Request: Judicial Notice
Date: March 20, 2019Hearing: Demurrer
Date: October 22, 2019Request: Judicial Notice
Date: June 25, 2018Response/Reply
Date: September 03, 2019Request: Judicial Notice
Date: May 01, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: July 01, 2019Response/Reply
Date: June 21, 2019Request: Dismissal
Date: October 15, 2019Hearing: Demurrer
Date: June 27, 2019Motion: Quash
Date: June 27, 2019Notice: Entry of Order
Date: July 17, 2019Minute Order
Date: October 22, 2019Minute Order
Date: September 04, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2019 | Hearing |
Hearing: Demurrer
Judge: Department 9 |
|
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing - POS RE: Motion to Quash Service of Summons- REJECTED by Judge Arand (As noted above, order rejected. Court will issue its own order after hte October 22 hearing.) |
|
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Response/Reply DEFENDANT DIVERSIFIED INVESTMENT SERVICE'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal without prejudice by Pro Per Plt Williams |
|
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE | |
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service amended complaint after demurrer |
|
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 03, 2019 | Hearing |
Hearing: Demurrer
Judge: Department 9 |
|
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order: Proposed Proposed Order Re Motion To Transfer Venue |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.