Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Saket Bhatia, Theos Medical Systems, Inc., A California Corporation, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Anthony Martin Boskovich, against Clapp, Moroney, Vucinich, Beeman & Scheley, Moroney, Vucinich, Bellagambam Beeman & Scheley, P. Christian Scheley, represented by Laura Rose Grealish, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Christopher G. Rudy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 27, 2018 |
CategoryProfessional Negligence Unlimited (25) |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
This complaint is a first amended complaint for professional negligence filed by plaintiffs Theos Medical Systems, Inc. and Saket Bhatia against defendants Clapp, Moroney, Vucinich, Bellagamba, Beeman & Scheley, a professional law corporation, and P....
Hearing: Demurrer
Date: June 20, 2019Hearing: Motion to Strike
Date: June 20, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: April 09, 2019Minute Order
Date: January 08, 2019Conference: Further Case Management
Date: January 08, 2019Conference: Case Management
Date: August 07, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: July 08, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: July 08, 2019Answer/Response (No Fee)
Date: October 25, 2019Demurrer
Date: July 08, 2019Minute Order
Date: May 21, 2019Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee
Date: June 03, 2019Minute Order
Date: June 20, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: December 31, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: April 09, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: December 19, 2018Application: Ex Parte (Fee Applies)
Date: September 27, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: April 09, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: April 09, 2019Order
Date: April 03, 2019Stipulation and Order
Date: September 27, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 01, 2018Minute Order
Date: August 07, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: July 26, 2018Demurrer
Date: July 26, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: July 26, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: July 26, 2018Motion: Strike
Date: July 26, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: July 26, 2018Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: April 27, 2018Request: Judicial Notice
Date: April 09, 2019Request: Judicial Notice
Date: October 01, 2019Response/Reply
Date: October 01, 2019Conference: Case Management
Date: May 21, 2019Request: Judicial Notice
Date: April 09, 2019Notice: Entry of Order
Date: October 02, 2018Request: Judicial Notice
Date: July 26, 2018Hearing: Demurrer
Date: October 08, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 06, 2018Order: Submitted Matter
Date: October 10, 2019Minute Order
Date: October 08, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: September 24, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: July 26, 2018Motion: Strike
Date: April 09, 2019Demurrer
Date: April 09, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 06, 2019Request: Judicial Notice
Date: July 26, 2018Request: Judicial Notice
Date: July 08, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 10, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice: Change Address/Firm Name Notice of Change of Address |
|
October 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response (No Fee) To First amended complaint ; atty: Halloran |
|
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order: Submitted Matter Order After Hearing on Defendant's Demurer to First Amended Complaint: See Order for Details; |
|
October 08, 2019 | Hearing |
Hearing: Demurrer
Judge: Department 7 |
|
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request: Judicial Notice Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice |
|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Response/Reply Reply to Demurrer to FAC |
|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Laura Grealish |
|
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections Hrg 10/08/19 - to Demurrer |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memorandum: Points and Authorities Hrg 10/08/19 - in Support of Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.