Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lopez Hugo, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Garber Cynthia Lynn, Karavatos Karen Lee, Robinson Mark Parker Jr, Zukin Helen, against Imerys Talc America Inc. Fka Luzenac America Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies Inc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Daniel J. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2018 |
CategoryProduct Liability (Not Asbestos Or Toxic/Environmental) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-21T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-24T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 29, 2023Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: July 17, 2023Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: November 02, 2020Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: November 02, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: January 07, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: February 02, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 28, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 01, 2021Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: March 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 22, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 23, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: May 07, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: May 21, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: June 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: June 10, 2021Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: June 25, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: July 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: July 15, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: July 21, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: August 24, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: October 05, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: September 20, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: October 08, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: October 12, 2021Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: October 12, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: October 13, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: October 20, 2021Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: October 20, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: October 21, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: October 28, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: November 10, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: November 12, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: February 10, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: January 12, 2022Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: March 14, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 14, 2022Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: April 20, 2022Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: July 06, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: July 06, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: October 24, 2022Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: December 29, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: December 29, 2022Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: February 21, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: February 21, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 07, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: June 13, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: July 14, 2023Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: July 14, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: July 17, 2023Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: July 17, 2023Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Hugo Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Informal Status Conference Re: Pleading on...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-07T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-07-14T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-24T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Informal Status Conference Re: Pleading on...))
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Status Conference))
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.