Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pacific Petroleum California Inc A California Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Stephens, Conrad B, against Hvi Cat Canyon Inc A Colorado Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeebe, Jed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management125 days |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2018 |
CategoryUnlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty (06) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement Entire Case, Filed | |
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Out of Court Control Conditional Settlement | |
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service, Filed | |
April 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint | |
April 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed | |
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed | |
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons Issued, Filed | |
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.