Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Burnett, Mark, Burnett, John Travis, filed a(n) Unlimited Other Complaint (42) - Injunctive Relief case represented by Scafide, James F, against Abc Escrow Inc, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Rigali, James F presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRigali, James F Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management96 days |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2018 |
CategoryUnlimited Other Complaint (42) - Injunctive Relief |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time37 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Rigali, James F |
|
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Staffel, Timothy J |
|
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
April 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration to OSC/Notice of Motion, Filed | |
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order, Filed | |
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed | |
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Hearing
Judge: Rigali, James F |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.