Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
King, Suzanne, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Loker, Matthew M, against Northstar Location Services, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeebe, Jed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management126 days |
Filing DateMarch 28, 2018 |
CategoryLimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd (23) - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time168 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: Fail to Appear
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Restored to Court's Control | |
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Full Dismissal With Prejudice, Filed | |
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Out of Court Control Conditional Settlement | |
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement Entire Case, Filed | |
August 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause, Filed | |
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Order, Filed | |
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.