Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Progressive West Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Nivinskus, Mark R, against Salas Ernst, Klancy Eugene, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeebe, Jed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management126 days |
Filing DateMarch 28, 2018 |
CategoryLimited Auto (22) - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time189 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Full Dismissal Without Prejudice, Filed | |
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Order, Filed | |
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed | |
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed | |
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons Issued, Filed | |
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint PI/PD/WD Motor Vehicle, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.