Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Danny Parker Construction, Parker, Danny, Friedman, Piri, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mauseth, Kevin M, against Danny Parker Construction, Parker, Danny, represented by Milani, Anthony R, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Geck, Donna D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGeck, Donna D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management135 days |
Filing DateMarch 28, 2018 |
CategoryUnlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty (06) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer to Cross Complaint, Filed | |
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Answer to Cross Complaint, Filed | |
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Demand for Trial by Jury, Filed | |
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint | |
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Cross Complaint | |
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint | |
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Cross Complaint, Filed | |
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Cross Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.