Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The Estate Of Peter Fleurat, Barajas, Ralph Lalo, Fleurat, Joseph Keith, Fleurat, Christy A., Fleurat Goetz, Constance, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Southern California Edison Company, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSterne, Colleen K Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management124 days |
Filing DateMarch 28, 2018 |
CategoryUnlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd (23) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed | |
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation & Order, Filed | |
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
April 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed | |
April 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
April 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint | |
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment/CMC, Filed | |
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.