Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Tang, Jason W, against Gibbons, Joseph D, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Rigali, James F presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRigali, James F Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 28, 2018 |
CategoryLimited Rule 3.740 Collections (09) - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time672 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Full Dismissal With Prejudice, Filed | |
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Full Dismissal With Prejudice, Filed | |
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed | |
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed | |
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons Issued, Filed | |
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Venue, Filed | |
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint for Damages, Filed | |
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.