Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lobel Financial Corp, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Huang, Shiaro-Wen, against Ortega, Jose A, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Rigali, James F presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRigali, James F Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 27, 2018 |
CategoryLimited Rule 3.740 Collections (09) - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions339 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time419 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment, Issued | |
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Court, Filed | |
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes, Filed | |
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment, Filed | |
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default, Filed | |
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint | |
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed | |
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons Issued, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.