Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Woodward, Andrew, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by May, Garrett, against Espinoza, Roberto Javier, Espinoza, Theresa Elizabeth Stevens, represented by Bale, Heather M, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSterne, Colleen K Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management125 days |
Filing DateMarch 27, 2018 |
CategoryUnlimited Auto (22) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time356 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
February 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Full Dismissal With Prejudice, Filed | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Order, Filed | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting of Jury Fees, Filed | |
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Answer/Response/Denial - Unlimited, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.