Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Torres, Marissa M, Woodworth, Taylor, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Kingsley, Eric B, against Sfm Llc, Sprouts Farmers Market Inc, represented by Cabral, Corey J, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Geck, Donna D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGeck, Donna D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management136 days |
Filing DateMarch 27, 2018 |
CategoryUnlimited Other Employment (15) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Case Cycle Time136 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Geck, Donna D |
|
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Full Dismissal Without Prejudice, Filed | |
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Resetting Hearing, Filed | |
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Answer/Response/Denial - Unlimited, Filed | |
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed | |
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint, Filed | |
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment/CMC, Filed | |
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed | |
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons Issued, Filed | |
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.