Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Taneja, Amit, against Demarrais, Laura, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Staffel, Timothy J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStaffel, Timothy J Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 27, 2018 |
CategoryLimited Rule 3.740 Collections (09) - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions286 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time286 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Returned | |
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Returned | |
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs/Credits/Interest, Filed | |
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued | |
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued | |
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs/Credits/Interest, Filed | |
February 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment, Issued | |
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Court, Filed | |
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Document, Filed | |
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.