Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capital On Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Bleier, Elizabeth A, against Sandoval, Jaime, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeebe, Jed Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 27, 2018 |
CategoryLimited Rule 3.740 Collections (09) - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions197 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time202 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued | |
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed | |
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address, Filed | |
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs/Credits/Interest, Filed | |
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment, Issued | |
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint | |
October 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
October 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes, Filed | |
October 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Clerk, Filed | |
October 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.