Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Morgan, Danika, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Long, Sam, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Anderle, Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnderle, Thomas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 27, 2018 |
CategorySmall Claims $1501 - $5000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time79 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Returned | |
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment, Filed | |
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs/Credits/Interest, Filed | |
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued | |
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed | |
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing
Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Document, Filed | |
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Plaintiff's Claim | |
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Small Claims |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.