Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ochoa, Nancy, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Maxwell, Pauline presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaxwell, Pauline Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 27, 2018 |
CategoryUnlimited Misc Petition - Name Change |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Case Cycle Time97 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Decree Changing Name, Filed | |
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: Name Change
Judge: Maxwell, Pauline |
|
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication, Filed | |
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service, Filed | |
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing Granted, Filed | |
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Hearing: Fee Waiver
Judge: Maxwell, Pauline |
|
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Hearing: Fee Waiver
Judge: Maxwell, Pauline |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.