Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yu, Chien-Ei, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Eck, John C, against Santana-Flores, Cesar Eduardo, Hernandez, Juan, 101 Plumbing, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Geck, Donna D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGeck, Donna D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management137 days |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2018 |
CategoryUnlimited Auto (22) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time221 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Geck, Donna D |
|
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Full Dismissal With Prejudice, Filed | |
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Continuance, Filed | |
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Geck, Donna D |
|
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.